TAYLOR v. CAPIO PARTNERS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: ALICIA TAYLOR
Defendant: CAPIO PARTNERS, LLC and CF MEDICAL, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00091
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 18 CLOSED DISMISSED. STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL - The parties, having reached a settlement of Plaintiff's individual claims against the Defendants, hereby stipulate to the dismissal of Plaintiff's individual claims with prejudice and dismissal of the claims of the putative class members without prejudice, each party to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 2/21/2019. (JDC)
February 21, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION of Dismissal , filed by Plaintiff ALICIA TAYLOR. (Philipps, David)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER directing filing of documents authorizing dismissal within 45 days of the date of this entry. All pending motions, if any, are now DENIED AS MOOT and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences, and trial, if any, are VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 2/7/2019.(CBU)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/14/2019 04:30 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 1/30/2019.(SWM)
January 30, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian D. Roth on behalf of Defendants CAPIO PARTNERS, LLC, CF MEDICAL, LLC. (Roth, Brian)
January 29, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CF MEDICAL, LLC. (Roth, Brian)
January 29, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAPIO PARTNERS, LLC. (Roth, Brian)
January 29, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by CF MEDICAL, LLC.(Roth, Brian)
January 29, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by CAPIO PARTNERS, LLC.(Roth, Brian)
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, John Thomas Steinkamp hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Pending Cases) (Steinkamp, John)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to CAPIO PARTNERS, LLC, CF MEDICAL, LLC. (REO)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Steinkamp on behalf of Plaintiff ALICIA TAYLOR. (Steinkamp, John)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Angie K. Robertson on behalf of Plaintiff ALICIA TAYLOR. (Robertson, Angie)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary E. Philipps on behalf of Plaintiff ALICIA TAYLOR. (Philipps, Mary)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Philipps on behalf of Plaintiff ALICIA TAYLOR. (Philipps, David)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CAPIO PARTNERS, LLC and CF MEDICAL, LLC, filed by ALICIA TAYLOR. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5230856) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Group A - Indiana Secretary of State Corporate Information, #2 Exhibit Group B - NNMLS Licensure Info, #3 Exhibit C - Collection Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons)(Philipps, David) Modified on 1/14/2019 (JDH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TAYLOR v. CAPIO PARTNERS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALICIA TAYLOR
Represented By: Mary E. Philipps
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: John Thomas Steinkamp
Represented By: Angie K. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPIO PARTNERS, LLC
Represented By: Brian D. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CF MEDICAL, LLC
Represented By: Brian D. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?