BABY MERLIN COMPANY v. CRIBCULTURE, LLC et al

Plaintiff: BABY MERLIN COMPANY
Defendant: ISAIAH BLACKBURN and CRIBCULTURE, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00176
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint, filed by Plaintiff BABY MERLIN COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed first amended complaint, #2 Exhibit A to first amended complaint, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Vetne, Jan)
February 20, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Steven G. Cracraft hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Cracraft, Steven)
February 20, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, William Kenneth Doss hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Doss, William)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2019 at 11:30 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 2/14/2019.(JRB)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #31 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Dennis J. Butler for BABY MERLIN COMPANY added. Copy sent to counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 2/14/2019. (JRB)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #32 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney John D. Simmons for BABY MERLIN COMPANY added. Copy sent to counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 2/14/2019. (JRB)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #30 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Bridget H. Labutta for BABY MERLIN COMPANY added. Copy sent to counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 2/14/2019. (JRB)
February 14, 2019 Filing 39 Submission of Signature Requirement re #32 MOTION for Attorney(s) John D. Simmons to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5281645) by BABY MERLIN COMPANY. (Vetne, Jan)
February 14, 2019 Filing 38 Submission of Signature Requirement re #31 MOTION for Attorney(s) Dennis J. Butler to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5281635) by BABY MERLIN COMPANY. (Vetne, Jan)
February 14, 2019 Filing 37 Submission of Signature Requirement re #30 MOTION for Attorney(s) Bridget H. Labutta to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5281607) by BABY MERLIN COMPANY. (Vetne, Jan)
February 12, 2019 Filing 36 Submission of Proposed Order , re #32 MOTION for Attorney(s) John D. Simmons to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5281645), filed by Plaintiff BABY MERLIN COMPANY. (Vetne, Jan)
February 12, 2019 Filing 35 Submission of Proposed Order , re #31 MOTION for Attorney(s) Dennis J. Butler to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5281635), filed by Plaintiff BABY MERLIN COMPANY. (Vetne, Jan)
February 12, 2019 Filing 34 Submission of Proposed Order , re #30 MOTION for Attorney(s) Bridget H. Labutta to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5281607), filed by Plaintiff BABY MERLIN COMPANY. (Vetne, Jan)
February 12, 2019 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CRIBCULTURE, LLC. (Doss, William)
February 12, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Attorney(s) John D. Simmons to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5281645), filed by Plaintiff BABY MERLIN COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a)(Vetne, Jan)
February 12, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Attorney(s) Dennis J. Butler to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5281635), filed by Plaintiff BABY MERLIN COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Vetne, Jan)
February 12, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Attorney(s) Bridget H. Labutta to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5281607), filed by Plaintiff BABY MERLIN COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a)(Vetne, Jan)
February 11, 2019 Filing 29 Statement Under S.D. Ind. L.R. 16-2 by BABY MERLIN COMPANY. (Vetne, Jan)
February 11, 2019 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BABY MERLIN COMPANY. (Vetne, Jan)
February 11, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Jan Thomas Vetne on behalf of Plaintiff BABY MERLIN COMPANY. (Vetne, Jan)
February 8, 2019 Filing 26 Statement Pursuant to Local Rule 16-2 by All Defendants. (Doss, William)
January 18, 2019 Filing 25 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-03288. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS TRANSFERRED TO THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF INDIANA. DEFENDANT ISAIAH BLACKBURN'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION AND FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (DOC. NO. #14 ) IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 12/17/2018.12/17/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/18/2019.]
December 2, 2018 Filing 23 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by ISAIAH BLACKBURN, CRIBCULTURE, LLC. (DOSS, WILLIAM) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/18/2019.]
November 28, 2018 Filing 22 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by BABY MERLIN COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C-E)(AXENFELD, ROBERT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/18/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 21 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by BABY MERLIN COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(AXENFELD, ROBERT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/18/2019.]
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER THAT A RULE TO SHOW CAUSE IS ISSUED FOR THE REASONS SET FORTH IN THE ORDER ATTACHED HERETO. THE RULE IS RETURNABLE BY WAY OF RESPONSE FROM PLAINTIFF NO LATER THAN NOVEMB3ER 19, 2018 AND DEEFENDANT, DECEMBER 3, 2018, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 11/5/2018. 11/5/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/18/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO Motion Hearing held on 11/2/18 COURT EVENT Court Reporter: ESR. (jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/18/2019.]
October 30, 2018 Filing 18 STATUS REPORT JOINT PURSUANT TO RULE 26(f) by BABY MERLIN COMPANY. (AXENFELD, ROBERT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/18/2019.]
October 23, 2018 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by BABY MERLIN COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G)(AXENFELD, ROBERT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/18/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER THAT A HEARING TO CONSIDER DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS #14 WILL BE HELD ON NOVEMBER 2, 2018 AT 2:00 P.M. IN COURTROOM 15A BEFORE HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/12/2018. 10/12/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/18/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE: A pretrial conference will be held on November 2, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 15A before the HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. (nds) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/18/2019.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by ISAIAH BLACKBURN.Memorandum, Declaration, Proposed Order. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration Declaration of Isaiah Blackbur, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(DOSS, WILLIAM) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/18/2019.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint together with Defenses by CRIBCULTURE, LLC.(DOSS, WILLIAM) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/18/2019.]
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO ADMIT WILLIAM K. DOSS, ESQUIRE #8 IS GRANTED AND MR. DOSS IS HEREBY ADMITTED AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 09/20/2018.09/20/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO MR. DOSS ALONG WITH AN ECF REGISTRATION APPLICATION AND E-MAILED.(nds) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/18/2019.]
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO ADMIT STEVEN G. CRACRAFT, ESQUIRE #7 IS GRANTED AND MR. CRACRAFT IS HEREBY ADMITTED AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 09/20/2018.09/20/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO MR. CRACRAFT ALONG WITH AN ECF REGISTRATION APPLICATION AND E-MAILED.(nds) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/18/2019.]
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE #6 IS GRANTED. AN ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN OCTOBER 10, 2018. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 09/10/2018. 09/11/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/18/2019.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint filed by BABY MERLIN COMPANY. (AXENFELD, ROBERT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/18/2019.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice William K. Doss ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13032427.) filed by ISAIAH BLACKBURN, CRIBCULTURE, LLC.Certificate of Service.(BREWER, DANIEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/18/2019.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Steven G. Cracraft ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13032379.) filed by ISAIAH BLACKBURN, CRIBCULTURE, LLC.Certificate of Service.(BREWER, DANIEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/18/2019.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint filed by ISAIAH BLACKBURN, CRIBCULTURE, LLC.Certificate of Service.(BREWER, DANIEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/18/2019.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Hoosier Process Service, LLC re: served Summons upon Caleb Motter c/o CribCulture, LLC by Hand Delivered on August 20, 2018 (AXENFELD, ROBERT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/18/2019.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Hoosier Process Service, LLC re: served Summons upon Isaiah Blackburn via Megan Blackburn by Hand Delivered on August 19, 2018 (AXENFELD, ROBERT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/18/2019.]
August 15, 2018 2 ALIAS Summons Issued as to ISAIAH BLACKBURN, CRIBCULTURE, LLC. HANDED OVER COUNTER TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 8/15/2018 (amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/18/2019.]
August 15, 2018 Filing 3 PRAECIPE FOR WRIT OF SUMMONS, BY BABY MERLIN COMPANY. (amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/18/2019.]
August 3, 2018 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) 4,271,544; 3,486,179; 5,006,620. (ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/18/2019.]
August 3, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by BABY MERLIN COMPANY. (ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/18/2019.]
August 3, 2018 Summons Issued as to ISAIAH BLACKBURN, CRIBCULTURE, LLC. 2 Forwarded To: Counsel on 8/3/2018 (ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/18/2019.]
August 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ISAIAH BLACKBURN, CRIBCULTURE, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 182555.), filed by BABY MERLIN COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheets)(ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 1/18/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BABY MERLIN COMPANY v. CRIBCULTURE, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BABY MERLIN COMPANY
Represented By: Robert Axenfeld
Represented By: Bridget H. Labutta
Represented By: Dennis J. Butler
Represented By: John D. Simmons
Represented By: Jan Thomas Vetne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISAIAH BLACKBURN
Represented By: William Kenneth Doss
Represented By: Daniel E. Brewer
Represented By: Steven G. Cracraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRIBCULTURE, LLC
Represented By: William Kenneth Doss
Represented By: Daniel E. Brewer
Represented By: Steven G. Cracraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?