LOCK, II v. NATIONAL CREDIT SYSTEMS, INC.
Plaintiff: KENNETH C LOCK, II and KENNETH CODY LOCK, II
Defendant: NATIONAL CREDIT SYSTEMS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00285
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Filing 15 RETURN of Service, filed by KENNETH CODY LOCK, II. NATIONAL CREDIT SYSTEMS, INC. served on 2/4/2019. (Philipps, David)
March 12, 2019 Filing 13 Witness List , filed by Plaintiff KENNETH CODY LOCK, II, Exhibit List , filed by Plaintiff KENNETH CODY LOCK, II. (Philipps, David)
March 12, 2019 Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff KENNETH CODY LOCK, II . (Philipps, David)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2019 01:30 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 3/1/2019.(SWM)
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONAL CREDIT SYSTEMS, INC.. (DeMarte, Katrina)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by NATIONAL CREDIT SYSTEMS, INC..(DeMarte, Katrina)
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Katrina M. DeMarte on behalf of Defendant NATIONAL CREDIT SYSTEMS, INC.. (DeMarte, Katrina)
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to NATIONAL CREDIT SYSTEMS, INC.. (HET)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Steinkamp on behalf of Plaintiff KENNETH C LOCK, II. (Steinkamp, John)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Angie K. Robertson on behalf of Plaintiff KENNETH C LOCK, II. (Robertson, Angie)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary E. Philipps on behalf of Plaintiff KENNETH C LOCK, II. (Philipps, Mary)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Philipps on behalf of Plaintiff KENNETH C LOCK, II. (Philipps, David)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL CREDIT SYSTEMS, INC., filed by KENNETH C LOCK, II. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5254330) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Indiana Secretary of State Corporate Information, #2 Exhibit B - NMLS State License Information, #3 Exhibit C - Bankruptcy Petition excerpt, #4 Exhibit D - Order of Discharge, #5 Exhibit E - Collection Letter, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons)(Philipps, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LOCK, II v. NATIONAL CREDIT SYSTEMS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH C LOCK, II
Represented By: Mary E. Philipps
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: Angie K. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH CODY LOCK, II
Represented By: Mary E. Philipps
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: Angie K. Robertson
Represented By: John Thomas Steinkamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL CREDIT SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: Katrina M. DeMarte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?