PLEDGER v. NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION et al
Plaintiff: JOSHUA PLEDGER
Defendant: VIRGINIA UNION UNIVERSITY and NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv00331
Filed: January 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 Remark - The Southern District of Indiana receives email notice from the Clerk of the Northern District of Illinois regarding electronic case transfer. This case was received electronically by the Northern District of Illinois on 2/20/2019 and was assigned case number 1:19-cv-01010 in the receiving court. (MAC)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Illinois. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Illinois, IN RE: MDL 2492 on February 15, 2019. (MAC)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 CLOSED TRANSFER to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois IN RE: MDL 2492 IN RE: National Collegiate Athletic Association Student-Athlete Concussion Injury Litigation Certified Transfer Order #18. (MAC)
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, VIRGINIA UNION UNIVERSITY. (REO)
January 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey L. Raizner on behalf of Plaintiff JOSHUA PLEDGER. (Raizner, Jeffrey)
January 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JOSHUA PLEDGER. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5254698) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Raizner, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PLEDGER v. NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIRGINIA UNION UNIVERSITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA PLEDGER
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Raizner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?