BREWER v. ENHANCED RECOVERY COMPANY, LLC
Plaintiff: TERESA BREWER
Defendant: ENHANCED RECOVERY COMPANY, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00600
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to 5/15/2019 in which to #9 Order , filed by Plaintiff TERESA BREWER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Philipps, David)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Court has been advised by counsel that a settlement has been reached in this matter. Accordingly, any pending motions are denied, without prejudice, as moot, and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences and trial, if any, are vacated. Parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal within 45 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 3/1/2019.(SWM)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of Service, filed by All Plaintiffs. ENHANCED RECOVERY COMPANY, LLC served on 2/12/2019. (Philipps, David)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Steinkamp on behalf of Plaintiff TERESA BREWER. (Steinkamp, John)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to ENHANCED RECOVERY COMPANY, LLC. (JRB)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Angie K. Robertson on behalf of Plaintiff TERESA BREWER. (Robertson, Angie)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary E. Philipps on behalf of Plaintiff TERESA BREWER. (Philipps, Mary)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Philipps on behalf of Plaintiff TERESA BREWER. (Philipps, David)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ENHANCED RECOVERY COMPANY, LLC, filed by TERESA BREWER. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5278560) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Indiana Secretary of State Corporate Information, #2 Exhibit B - NMLS State License Information, #3 Exhibit C - Attorney Dispute Letter, #4 Exhibit D - excerpts of TransUnion Credit Report, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons)(Philipps, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BREWER v. ENHANCED RECOVERY COMPANY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERESA BREWER
Represented By: Mary E. Philipps
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: Angie K. Robertson
Represented By: John Thomas Steinkamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENHANCED RECOVERY COMPANY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?