MARTIN et al v. FORD MOTOR COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: LINDA MARTIN, LAURA MARTIN and ELBERT MARTIN
Defendant: BRIAN BOZIK and FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv00628
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER #25 SO ORDERED.Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 4/12/2019.(SWM)
April 10, 2019 Filing 25 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Specifically Submitted to Cure Issue Raised by Magistrate's March 26, 2019 Order [Doc. No. 23]), filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order)(Shelby, Blake)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Regarding Discovery Disputes. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 4/4/2019.(SWM)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MARGINAL ENTRY denying Defendant Ford Motor Company's #20 Motion for Protective Order. See Entry. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 3/26/2019. (SWM)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 3/12/2020. Discovery due by 3/12/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 3/26/2019.(SWM)
March 26, 2019 Filing 21 Entry and Order from Initial Pretrial Conference - The parties, by counsel, appeared for an initial pretrial conference on March 21, 2019, with the magistrate judge. The case management plan submitted in this case is approved as modified by the magistrate judge in the margins of the case management plan. This case is set for a telephone status conference on September 23, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. (Eastern), with Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. (AKW)
March 25, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Protective Order , filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order)(Shelby, Blake)
March 18, 2019 Filing 19 Mail Returned as undeliverable - RTS/not deliverable as addressed/unable to forward re #12 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice Copy sent to Attorney Francisco Guerra, IV via US Mail on behalf of Plaintiff. (DWH)
March 13, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Notice of Removal, re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiffs ELBERT MARTIN, LAURA MARTIN, LINDA MARTIN. (Reese, Jason)
March 12, 2019 Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Stipulated Protective Order)(Shelby, Blake)
March 7, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Shalimar S. Wallis on behalf of Plaintiffs ELBERT MARTIN, LAURA MARTIN, LINDA MARTIN. (Wallis, Shalimar)
March 7, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Francisco Guerra, IV on behalf of Plaintiffs ELBERT MARTIN, LAURA MARTIN, LINDA MARTIN. (Guerra, Francisco)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Shalimar S. Wallis for ELBERT MARTIN, LAURA MARTIN and LINDA MARTIN added. The court FURTHER ORDERS that Shalimar S. Wallis register as a user of the court's electronic case filing system by March 18, 2019. Failure to register could result in the revocation of her admission pro hac vice. Copy to Shalimar S. Wallis via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 3/4/2019. (SWM)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Francisco Guerra, IV for ELBERT MARTIN, LAURA MARTIN and LINDA MARTIN added. The court FURTHER ORDERS that Francisco Guerra, IV register as a user of the court's electronic case filing system by March 18, 2019. Failure to register could result in the revocation of his admission pro hac vice. Copy to Francisco Guerra, IV via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 3/4/2019. (SWM)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #8 Motion for Continuance. Initial Pretrial Conference RESET for 3/21/2019 02:00 PM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The remaining provisions of the court's scheduling order at Dkt. #7 remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 3/4/2019.(SWM)
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Shalimar S. Wallis to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5311674), filed by Plaintiffs ELBERT MARTIN, LAURA MARTIN, LINDA MARTIN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Jason)
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Francisco Guerra, IV to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5311608), filed by Plaintiffs ELBERT MARTIN, LAURA MARTIN, LINDA MARTIN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Reese, Jason)
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pretrial Conference, filed by Plaintiffs ELBERT MARTIN, LAURA MARTIN, LINDA MARTIN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Reese, Jason)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/14/2019 09:30 AM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 2/22/2019.(SWM)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY.(Schiferl, Kevin)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Blake N. Shelby on behalf of Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Shelby, Blake)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Schiferl, Kevin)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin C. Schiferl on behalf of Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Schiferl, Kevin)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Superior Court 2, case number 49D02-1901-CT-02965, filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5282872) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint for Damages and Request for Jury Trial, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Record: Complaint, Appearance of Jason Reese, Summons, Appearance of Kevin Schiferl and Blake Shelby, Notice of Automatic Enlargement of Time, Plaintiffs' Motion for Change of Judge, Order Granting Motion for Change of Judge, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schiferl, Kevin) Modified on 2/12/2019 (double docket text in attachment descriptions) (DJH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARTIN et al v. FORD MOTOR COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA MARTIN
Represented By: Jason Ruskin Reese
Represented By: Shalimar S. Wallis
Represented By: Francisco Guerra, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAURA MARTIN
Represented By: Jason Ruskin Reese
Represented By: Shalimar S. Wallis
Represented By: Francisco Guerra, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELBERT MARTIN
Represented By: Jason Ruskin Reese
Represented By: Shalimar S. Wallis
Represented By: Francisco Guerra, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN BOZIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Represented By: Blake N. Shelby
Represented By: Kevin C. Schiferl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?