TOOLEY v. JOSEPH OCALA, LLC

Plaintiff: DENNIS TOOLEY
Defendant: JOSEPH OCALA, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00751
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - THIS MATTER came before the Court on Plaintiff's and Defendant's Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The Court having reviewed said Stipulation, and being otherwise fully advised, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice #11 . Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 4/16/2019.(JDH)
April 16, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice, filed by Plaintiff DENNIS TOOLEY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mussman, Louis Ivan)
March 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time to respond to complaint. Answer or response will now be due on or before 4/16/2019, filed by Defendant JOSEPH OCALA, LLC. (SWM)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Katherine L. Swise for JOSEPH OCALA, LLC added. Counsel shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-3, within 7 days. Defendant's Notice of Initial Enlargement of Time [Filing No. 8-2] is accepted for filing and is deemed timely filed as of the date of this order. Copy to Katherine L. Swise via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 3/19/2019. (SWM)
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Katherine L. Swise to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100.00, receipt number IP064360), filed by Defendant JOSEPH OCALA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Agreed Notice of Initial Enlargement of Time, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope)(JDH)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service, filed by DENNIS TOOLEY. JOSEPH OCALA, LLC served on 2/26/2019. (Mussman, Louis Ivan)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (MRI)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to JOSEPH OCALA, LLC. (REO)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric C. Bohnet on behalf of Plaintiff DENNIS TOOLEY. (Bohnet, Eric)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis Ivan Christopher Mussman on behalf of Plaintiff DENNIS TOOLEY. (Mussman, Louis Ivan)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOSEPH OCALA, LLC, filed by DENNIS TOOLEY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5293916) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Mussman, Louis Ivan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TOOLEY v. JOSEPH OCALA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS TOOLEY
Represented By: Louis Ivan Christopher Mussman
Represented By: Eric C. Bohnet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH OCALA, LLC
Represented By: Katherine L. Swise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?