SENECA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY v. INVESTORS TITLECORP et al
Plaintiff: SENECA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: INVESTORS TITLECORP and FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv00839
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to INVESTORS TITLECORP. (NAD)
April 4, 2019 Filing 13 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to INVESTORS TITLECORP. (Litchfield, Phillip)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/20/2019 at 11:30 AM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. No fewer than seven (7)days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 3/22/2019.(CBU)
March 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt V. Laker on behalf of Defendant FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Laker, Kurt)
March 21, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent FIRST AMERICAN FINANCIAL CORPORATION for FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY.. (Laker, Kurt)
March 21, 2019 Filing 9 First American Title Insurance Company's ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY.(Laker, Kurt)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, INVESTORS TITLECORP. (NAD)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip Glen Litchfield on behalf of Plaintiff SENECA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Litchfield, Phillip)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis M. Dolan on behalf of Plaintiff SENECA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Dolan, Dennis)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to INVESTORS TITLECORP. (Dolan, Dennis)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Dolan, Dennis)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET , filed by Plaintiff SENECA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Dolan, Dennis)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, INVESTORS TITLECORP, filed by SENECA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5306333) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First American's Third Party Complaint, #2 Exhibit Abstractor Agency Contract, #3 Exhibit Insurance Policy)(Dolan, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SENECA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY v. INVESTORS TITLECORP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INVESTORS TITLECORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Kurt V. Laker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SENECA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Dennis M. Dolan
Represented By: Phillip Glen Litchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?