COLLINS et al v. OGLE et al

Plaintiff: ROZELL MORRIS and SHE'AUNA COLLINS
Defendant: JAMES OGLE and GULLY TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00902
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ON APRIL 22, 2019, INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE - Parties appeared by counsel April 22, 2019, for an initial pretrial conference. The Case Management Plan is stayed. [Filing No. 11.] This cause is set for a telephonic status conference at 10 a.m. on May 23, 2019. Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. The purpose of this conference is to discuss settlement and jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. (MGG)
April 10, 2019 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendants GULLY TRANSPORTATION, INC., JAMES OGLE . (Hoy, Jason)
April 9, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Trial by Jury, filed by GULLY TRANSPORTATION, INC., JAMES OGLE.(Whitten, Christopher)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/22/2019 02:00 PM (Eastern Time) in room #234, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 3/26/2019.(SWM)
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 Statement Responding to Allegations of Notice of Removal by All Plaintiffs. (Foushee, Nathan)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan D. Foushee on behalf of Plaintiffs SHE'AUNA COLLINS, ROZELL MORRIS. (Foushee, Nathan)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason J. Hoy on behalf of Defendants GULLY TRANSPORTATION, INC., JAMES OGLE. (Hoy, Jason)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants GULLY TRANSPORTATION, INC., JAMES OGLE. (Whitten, Christopher)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GULLY TRANSPORTATION, INC.. (Whitten, Christopher)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. Whitten on behalf of Defendants GULLY TRANSPORTATION, INC., JAMES OGLE. (Whitten, Christopher)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hendricks Superior Court 4, case number 32D04-1902-CT-25, filed by All Defendants. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5314195) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Responses to First Request for Admissions, #2 Exhibit B - Appearance of Nathan Foushee, Complaint for Damages, Summons to James Ogle, Summons to Gully Transportation, Inc., Green Card for Service on James Ogle, Green Card for service on Gully Transportation, Inc., Appearance of Christopher R. Whitten, Defendants' Motion for Enlargement of Time, Order on Defendants' Motion for Enlargement of Time, #3 Exhibit C - Complaint for Damages, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Docket, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Whitten, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COLLINS et al v. OGLE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROZELL MORRIS
Represented By: Nathan D. Foushee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHE'AUNA COLLINS
Represented By: Nathan D. Foushee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES OGLE
Represented By: Jason J. Hoy
Represented By: Christopher R. Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GULLY TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Represented By: Jason J. Hoy
Represented By: Christopher R. Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?