WILKERSON v. FREEMAN

Plaintiff: SHAINA WILKERSON
Defendant: FRANCIS FREEMAN and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00936
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Filing 15 Mail Returned as undeliverable - RTS/Moved Left No Address - Unable to Forward re #14 Entry sent to SHAINA WILKERSON - 406 E. Caven Street, Indianapolis, IN 46225. (DWH)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENTRY SETTING CASE DEADLINES - Two of the Court's orders mailed to Ms. Wilkerson at 4052 Malden Lane Apt A, Beech Grove, Indiana 46107 have been returned as undeliverable. Dkt. 8; dkt. 9. The government has provided an updated address of 406 E. Caven Street, Indianapolis, IN 46225. Dkt. 11-1. Ms. Wilkerson SHALL CONFIRM her current address to the Court by May 17, 2019. If Ms. Wilkerson does not keep the Court informed of her current address, the action may be subject to dismissal. The government has filed a motion for summary judgment. Dkt. 12. Ms. Wilkerson SHALL RESPOND by May 31, 2019. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 4/18/2019. Copies distributed pursuant to distribution list. (DWH)
April 15, 2019 Filing 13 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON FAILURE TO EXHAUST DEFENSE , filed by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Olson, Justin)
April 15, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON FAILURE TO EXHAUST DEFENSE, filed by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hal Dronberger)(Olson, Justin)
April 15, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Form)(Olson, Justin)
April 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FOR DEFENDANT FRANCIS FREEMAN, filed by Defendant FRANCIS FREEMAN (Attachments: #1 Certification of Scope of Employment) (Olson, Justin)
April 10, 2019 Filing 9 Mail Returned as undeliverable - RTS/moved left no address. #7 Order on Motion for Extension of Time sent to SHAINA WILKERSON - 4052 Malden Lane Apt. A Beech Grove, IN 46107. (DWH)
April 2, 2019 Filing 8 Mail Returned as undeliverable - RTS/moved left no address. #6 Scheduling Order sent to SHAINA WILKERSON 4052 Malden Lane Apt. A Beech Grove, IN 46107. (DWH)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to 4/15/2019 for the Defendant to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 3/28/2019 (dist made) (CBU)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER-Pro Se Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/8/2019 at 11:30 AM (Eastern) in room #243, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 3/22/2019 (dist made)(CBU)
March 14, 2019 Filing 5 Submission of Additional State Court Records. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DWH)
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to April 15, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiffs Complaint, filed by Defendant FRANCIS FREEMAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olson, Justin)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin R. Olson on behalf of Defendant FRANCIS FREEMAN. (Olson, Justin)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Small Claims Court, Center Township, case number 49K01-1902-SC-000966, filed by FRANCIS FREEMAN. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Record Combined complaint, docket sheet, notice of return, #3 State Court Record Notice of claim)(Olson, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILKERSON v. FREEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANCIS FREEMAN
Represented By: Justin R. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Justin R. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAINA WILKERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?