COLEMAN v. MERCHANDISE WAREHOUSE CO.

Plaintiff: ALONZO LENDALE COLEMAN
Defendant: MERCHANDISE WAREHOUSE CO.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01084
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Denying Request for Summary Judgment and Addressing Briefing of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss: The defendant's alternative motion for summary judgment (Dkt. #14 ), included with its motion to dismiss, is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The defendant's motion to dismiss remains pending and the court will address further briefing of that motion at an initial pretrial conference, which has been set by separate entry for August 8, 2019. The plaintiff is not required to respond to the motion to dismiss at this time. See Order for additional information. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/28/2019.(SWM)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/8/2019 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) in room #270, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Please bring a copy of this order with you to the conference. Failure to attend this pretrial conference may subject your case to dismissal (if a plaintiff) or default (if a defendant). See Order for additional information. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/19/2019.(SWM)
June 14, 2019 Filing 16 Designation of Evidence re #14 MOTION to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment, #15 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendant MERCHANDISE WAREHOUSE CO.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Position Statement)(Foley, Donald)
June 14, 2019 Filing 15 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment , filed by Defendant MERCHANDISE WAREHOUSE CO.. (Foley, Donald)
June 14, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendant MERCHANDISE WAREHOUSE CO.. (Foley, Donald)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge, The Honorable Debra McVicker Lynch, to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73. Should this case be reassigned to a magistrate judge other than the magistrate judge assigned the date of this order, any attorney or party of record may object within 30 days of such reassignment. The cause number of this action shall be amended as shown above to reflect the referral of this action to the Magistrate Judge. Please use altered case no. 1:19-cv-01084-DML-SEB on all future filings with this court. Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 5/8/2019.(MAC)
May 6, 2019 Filing 12 JOINT CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by MERCHANDISE WAREHOUSE CO.. (Foley, Donald)
April 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Defendant MERCHANDISE WAREHOUSE CO.. (Foley, Donald)
April 17, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by ALONZO LENDALE COLEMAN. (no envelope) (CKM) Modified on 4/17/2019 (CKM).
April 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to MERCHANDISE WAREHOUSE CO.. (LAB) (CKM)
April 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald F. Foley on behalf of Defendant MERCHANDISE WAREHOUSE CO.. (Foley, Donald)
April 11, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by MERCHANDISE WAREHOUSE CO.. MERCHANDISE WAREHOUSE CO. waiver sent on 4/9/2019. (Foley, Donald)
April 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk. (MAC)
April 3, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY Discussing Action and Directing Service of process to defendant. (See Entry). Copies mailed. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 4/3/2019. (MAC)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis Dkt. #3 is GRANTED. 28 U.S.C. 1915(e). While in forma pauperis status allows the plaintiff to proceed without pre-payment of the $350.00 filing fee, the plaintiff remains liable for the full fees. Robbins v. Switzer, 104 F.3d 895, 898 (7th Cir. 1997) ("Unsuccessful litigants are liable for fees and costs and must pay when they are able."). No payment is due at this time. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 4/3/2019. Copy Mailed. (CKM)
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff ALONZO LENDALE COLEMAN. (REO)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MERCHANDISE WAREHOUSE CO., filed by ALONZO LENDALE COLEMAN. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 charge of Discrimination, #2 Inquiry Information, #3 Dismissal and Notice of Rights, #4 Screenshots)(REO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COLEMAN v. MERCHANDISE WAREHOUSE CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCHANDISE WAREHOUSE CO.
Represented By: Donald F. Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALONZO LENDALE COLEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?