PAURICH v. STS AVIATION GROUP, INC. et al

Plaintiff: RACHELLE PAURICH
Defendant: STS AVIATION GROUP, INC. and STS AVIATION GROUP, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01110
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS SUBMITTED. Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/11/2019. Discovery due by 1/20/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/20/2020. Settlement Conference set for 11/5/2019 at 02:00 PM (Eastern Time) in room #316, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. Status Conference set for 10/2/2019 at 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 6/13/2019.(TMB)
June 4, 2019 Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendants STS AVIATION GROUP, INC., STS AVIATION GROUP, LLC . (Couture, Amanda)
May 13, 2019 Filing 13 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, filed by All Defendants.(Couture, Amanda)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 6/11/2019 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 5/2/2019.(JRB)
April 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Darron S. Stewart on behalf of Plaintiff RACHELLE PAURICH. (Stewart, Darron)
April 15, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by STS AVIATION GROUP, INC., STS AVIATION GROUP, LLC. (Couture, Amanda)
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants STS AVIATION GROUP, INC., STS AVIATION GROUP, LLC. (Couture, Amanda)
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew John Maloney on behalf of Defendants STS AVIATION GROUP, INC., STS AVIATION GROUP, LLC. (Maloney, Andrew)
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda C. Couture on behalf of Defendants STS AVIATION GROUP, INC., STS AVIATION GROUP, LLC. (Couture, Amanda)
March 29, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by RACHELLE PAURICH. STS AVIATION GROUP, INC. served on 3/25/2019; STS AVIATION GROUP, LLC served on 3/25/2019. (Falks, Heather)
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to STS AVIATION GROUP, INC., STS AVIATION GROUP, LLC. (HET)
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Stewart on behalf of Plaintiff RACHELLE PAURICH. (Stewart, David)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather R. Falks on behalf of Plaintiff RACHELLE PAURICH. (Falks, Heather)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against STS AVIATION GROUP, INC., STS AVIATION GROUP, LLC, filed by RACHELLE PAURICH. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5342755) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dismissal & Notice of Rights, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Falks, Heather)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PAURICH v. STS AVIATION GROUP, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STS AVIATION GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Amanda C. Couture
Represented By: Andrew John Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STS AVIATION GROUP, LLC
Represented By: Amanda C. Couture
Represented By: Andrew John Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RACHELLE PAURICH
Represented By: Heather R. Falks
Represented By: David W. Stewart
Represented By: Darron S. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?