DOOR 2 DOOR FLOORS, LLC v. BEAUTIFUL SURFACES INC. et al
Plaintiff: DOOR 2 DOOR FLOORS, LLC, DOOR, GARAGE KINGS CANADA and GARAGE KINGS USA
Defendant: MIKE WISEMEN, DRAKE MYERS, TIM FRAZIER, RICK MYERS, JAMIE SEAMANS, MARY MYERS, DEVIN MYERS, BEAUTIFUL SURFACES, INC., BEAUTIFUL SURFACES, INC. a Canadian Corporation doing business as GARAGE KINGS and MIKE WISEMEN doing business as GARAGE KINGS OF INDIANA
Case Number: 1:2019cv01136
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Doris L Pryor
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor: The parties appeared by telephone for a Status Conference on June 28, 2019. The parties discussed the status of and future plans for discovery. The parties alsodiscussed the Settlement Conference scheduled for July 30, 2019. The parties reported that they are ready to proceed in good faith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (CAG)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHOIC Settlement Conference set for 7/30/2019 01:30 PM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 5/17/2019.(CBU)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court sua sponte now RESCHEDULES the Settlement Conference currently scheduled for July 19, 2019 to July 30, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (Eastern) in Room 255, United States Courthouse, 46 East Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 5/13/2019.(SWM) Modified on 5/17/2019 (CAG).
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor: The parties appeared by counsel for an Initial Pretrial Conference on May 8, 2019. Parties requested a settlement conference be set. The Initial Pretrial Conference is CONTINUED to August 21, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. Counsel shall attend the status conference by calling the designated phone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. This matter is scheduled for a telephonic status conference on June 28, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. (Eastern) to discuss case status. Counsel shall attend the status conference by calling the designated phone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. Additionally, this matter is scheduled for a settlement conference on July 19, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Eastern), in Room 255, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana, before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (CAG)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Kevin M. Shelley for BEAUTIFUL SURFACES, INC., TIM FRAZIER and JAMIE SEAMANS added. Applicant shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-3, within ten (10) days of the entry of this Order. Copy to Kevin M. Shelley via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 5/3/2019. (SWM) Modified on 5/6/2019 (SWM).
May 1, 2019 Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff DOOR 2 DOOR FLOORS, LLC . (Ayoubi, Mohammad)
April 26, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kevin M. Shelley to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5401879), filed by Defendants BEAUTIFUL SURFACES, INC., TIM FRAZIER, JAMIE SEAMANS, Counter Claimants BEAUTIFUL SURFACES, INC., TIM FRAZIER, JAMIE SEAMANS. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ridolfo, Anthony)
April 24, 2019 Filing 19 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants DEVIN MYERS, DRAKE MYERS, MARY MYERS, RICK MYERS. (Stake, Christopher)
April 24, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants DEVIN MYERS, DRAKE MYERS, MARY MYERS, RICK MYERS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Stake, Christopher)
April 4, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, filed by Plaintiff DOOR 2 DOOR FLOORS, LLC. (Ayoubi, Mohammad) Modified text on 4/5/2019 (TMB).
April 4, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Mohammad Slaimon Ayoubi on behalf of Plaintiff DOOR 2 DOOR FLOORS, LLC. (Ayoubi, Mohammad)
March 29, 2019 Filing 15 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against DOOR 2 DOOR FLOORS, LLC, filed by TIM FRAZIER, BEAUTIFUL SURFACES, INC., JAMIE SEAMANS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ridolfo, Anthony)
March 25, 2019 Filing 14 Submission of Additional State Court Records received from the Clerk of Marion County. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (MAC)
March 25, 2019 Filing 13 Submission of Additional State Court Records received from the Clerk of Marion County. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (MAC)
March 22, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants DEVIN MYERS, DRAKE MYERS, MARY MYERS, RICK MYERS. (Stake, Christopher)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/8/2019 at 10:00 AM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 3/22/2019.(CBU)
March 21, 2019 Filing 10 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
March 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to DOOR 2 DOOR FLOORS, LLC. (LAB) (JRB) Modified on 3/21/2019 (JRB).
March 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher S. Stake on behalf of Defendants DEVIN MYERS, DRAKE MYERS, MARY MYERS, RICK MYERS. (Stake, Christopher)
March 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann DeLaney on behalf of Defendants DEVIN MYERS, DRAKE MYERS, MARY MYERS, RICK MYERS. (DeLaney, Kathleen)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BEAUTIFUL SURFACES INC. A CANADIAN CORPORATION D/B/A GARAGE KINGS, A/K/A GARAGE KINGS CANADA A/K/A GARAGE KINGS USA, TIM FRAZIER, JAMIE SEAMANS. (Ridolfo, Anthony)
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Seaton Ridolfo, Jr on behalf of Defendants BEAUTIFUL SURFACES INC. A CANADIAN CORPORATION D/B/A GARAGE KINGS, A/K/A GARAGE KINGS CANADA A/K/A GARAGE KINGS USA, TIM FRAZIER, JAMIE SEAMANS. (Ridolfo, Anthony)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Seaton Ridolfo, Jr on behalf of Defendants BEAUTIFUL SURFACES INC. A CANADIAN CORPORATION D/B/A GARAGE KINGS, A/K/A GARAGE KINGS CANADA A/K/A GARAGE KINGS USA, TIM FRAZIER, JAMIE SEAMANS. (Ridolfo, Anthony)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET , filed by Defendants BEAUTIFUL SURFACES INC. A CANADIAN CORPORATION D/B/A GARAGE KINGS, A/K/A GARAGE KINGS CANADA A/K/A GARAGE KINGS USA, TIM FRAZIER, JAMIE SEAMANS. (Ridolfo, Anthony)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Seaton Ridolfo, Jr on behalf of Defendants BEAUTIFUL SURFACES INC. A CANADIAN CORPORATION D/B/A GARAGE KINGS, A/K/A GARAGE KINGS CANADA A/K/A GARAGE KINGS USA, TIM FRAZIER, JAMIE SEAMANS. (Ridolfo, Anthony)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Civil Court 1, case number 49D01-1902-PL-006428, filed by TIM FRAZIER, BEAUTIFUL SURFACES INC. A CANADIAN CORPORATION D/B/A GARAGE KINGS, A/K/A GARAGE KINGS CANADA A/K/A GARAGE KINGS USA, JAMIE SEAMANS. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5345459) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Ridolfo, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOOR 2 DOOR FLOORS, LLC v. BEAUTIFUL SURFACES INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOOR 2 DOOR FLOORS, LLC
Represented By: Mohammad Slaimon Ayoubi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOOR
Represented By: Mohammad Slaimon Ayoubi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARAGE KINGS CANADA
Represented By: Mohammad Slaimon Ayoubi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARAGE KINGS USA
Represented By: Mohammad Slaimon Ayoubi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE WISEMEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRAKE MYERS
Represented By: Kathleen Ann DeLaney
Represented By: Christopher S. Stake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIM FRAZIER
Represented By: Anthony Seaton Ridolfo, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin M. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICK MYERS
Represented By: Kathleen Ann DeLaney
Represented By: Christopher S. Stake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMIE SEAMANS
Represented By: Anthony Seaton Ridolfo, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin M. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY MYERS
Represented By: Kathleen Ann DeLaney
Represented By: Christopher S. Stake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEVIN MYERS
Represented By: Kathleen Ann DeLaney
Represented By: Christopher S. Stake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEAUTIFUL SURFACES, INC.
Represented By: Anthony Seaton Ridolfo, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin M. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEAUTIFUL SURFACES, INC. a Canadian Corporation doing business as GARAGE KINGS
Represented By: Anthony Seaton Ridolfo, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin M. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE WISEMEN doing business as GARAGE KINGS OF INDIANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?