HEATH v. PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

Plaintiff: SAMUEL HEATH
Defendant: PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA and JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. EMPLOYEE WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN
Case Number: 1:2019cv01208
Filed: March 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Regarding Discovery Disputes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 6/18/2019.(CBU)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Discovery due by 2/26/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/26/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 6/18/2019.(CBU)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor: The parties appeared by counsel for an Initial Pretrial Conference on May 24, 2019. The parties intend to seek cross-motions for summary judgment.This matter is scheduled for a telephonic status conference on September 6, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. (Eastern) to discuss case status. Counsel shall attend the status conference by calling the designated phone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (CAG)
May 13, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Burgess, Jennifer)
May 13, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA.(Burgess, Jennifer)
May 10, 2019 Filing 16 Proposed CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff SAMUEL HEATH . (Marks, Ashley)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Continuance. Initial Pretrial Conference RESET for 5/24/2019 02:30 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 5/7/2019.(SWM)
May 6, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pretrial Conference, filed by Plaintiff SAMUEL HEATH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marks, Ashley)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/21/2019 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 4/26/2019.(SWM)
April 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Schwartz-Fenwick on behalf of Defendant PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Schwartz-Fenwick, Samuel)
April 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Elizabeth Burgess on behalf of Defendant PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Burgess, Jennifer)
April 9, 2019 Filing 10 DISMISSAL (Marginal Notation) - The Court acknowledges the Stipulation of Dismissal, dkt. #8 . The Clerk is DIRECTED to DISMISS this case only as to Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Employee Welfare Benefit Plan. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 4/9/2019.(DWH) Modified on 4/10/2019 (DWH).
April 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Morrison, Ian)
April 8, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal (STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. EMPLOYEE WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN), filed by Defendant PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Morrison, Ian)
April 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Hugh Morrison on behalf of Defendant PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Morrison, Ian)
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 TRIAL PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (DWH)
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (NLR)
March 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. EMPLOYEE WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN, and PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (NLR)
March 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa A. Davidson on behalf of Plaintiff SAMUEL HEATH. (Davidson, Melissa)
March 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley D. Marks on behalf of Plaintiff SAMUEL HEATH. (Marks, Ashley)
March 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. EMPLOYEE WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN, PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, filed by SAMUEL HEATH. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5352672) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Marks, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HEATH v. PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: Ian Hugh Morrison
Represented By: Jennifer Elizabeth Burgess
Represented By: Samuel Schwartz-Fenwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. EMPLOYEE WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMUEL HEATH
Represented By: Ashley D. Marks
Represented By: Melissa A. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?