BROOKS-ALBRECHTSEN v. COCA-COLA BOTTLING CO. CONSOLIDATED, INC. et al
Plaintiff: MARK A. BROOKS-ALBRECHTSEN
Defendant: COCA-COLA BOTTLING CO. CONSOLIDATED, INC., MANDI WALKER, JAY JACKSON, AMY SOUERS, MATTHEW ADAMS, WILLARD BONTRAGER and KEITH JAEGER
Case Number: 1:2019cv01236
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 30 CLOSED DISMISSED - MARGINAL ENTRY - The Court acknowledges the Consent Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice, dkt. #29 . Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 6/28/2019.(JDH)
June 27, 2019 Filing 29 STIPULATION of Dismissal Consent Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice, filed by Defendants MATTHEW ADAMS, WILLARD BONTRAGER, COCA-COLA BOTTLING CO. CONSOLIDATED, INC., JAY JACKSON, KEITH JAEGER, AMY SOUERS, MANDI WALKER. (Wasser, Brent)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor: Plaintiff appeared Pro Se and Defendant appeared in person for an initial pretrial conference. The conference was held and concluded without further order.Additionally, the parties appeared in person and by counsel for a settlement conference. A settlement has been reached in this action. Therefore, all pending motions, if any, are now DENIED AS MOOT and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences, and trial, if any, are VACATED. Within thirty (30) days of the date of this entry, the parties shall file a motion to dismiss this cause and submit an order for the Court's signature ordering the dismissal of this action or a stipulation of dismissal (consistent with the agreement of the parties). Additional time to complete the execution of the settlement documents may be granted for good cause shown, if requested in writing before expiration of this period. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (CAG)
May 17, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 MOTION For Court Intervention, For Leave to Withdraw Plaintiffs Memorandum in Opposition To Defendants Partial Motion to Dismiss, and For Leave to File an Amended Responsive Pleading, filed by Defendants MATTHEW ADAMS, WILLARD BONTRAGER, COCA-COLA BOTTLING CO. CONSOLIDATED, INC., JAY JACKSON, KEITH JAEGER, AMY SOUERS, MANDI WALKER. (Wasser, Brent)
May 15, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COUNT II VIOLATION OF THE CIVIL RIGHTS ACT OF 1964, filed by Defendants MATTHEW ADAMS, WILLARD BONTRAGER, COCA-COLA BOTTLING CO. CONSOLIDATED, INC., JAY JACKSON, KEITH JAEGER, AMY SOUERS, MANDI WALKER. (Wasser, Brent)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME - Defendants have moved for an extension of time to file their reply in support of their motion to dismiss. Dkt. #23 . For the reasons in the motion, the Court GRANTS the motion; the deadline for Defendants' reply brief is extended to May 17, 2019. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 5/8/2019. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. (DWH)
May 7, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Court Intervention, for Leave to Withdraw Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss and for Leave to File an Amended Responsive Pleading, filed by Plaintiff MARK A. BROOKS-ALBRECHTSEN. (DWH)
May 7, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to May 17, 2019 re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants MATTHEW ADAMS, WILLARD BONTRAGER, COCA-COLA BOTTLING CO. CONSOLIDATED, INC., JAY JACKSON, KEITH JAEGER, AMY SOUERS, MANDI WALKER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order ORDER ON MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME)(Wasser, Brent)
May 3, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY in Support of Motion re #6 MOTION for the Court to Determine Supplemental Jurisdiction of Plaintiff's Pendent Claim, filed by Plaintiff MARK A. BROOKS-ALBRECHTSEN. (NAD)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to 5/3/2019 for the Plaintiff to file his reply brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 5/1/2019. (CBU) Modified on 5/2/2019 (CBU)(dist made)
April 29, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE (Memorandum) in Opposition re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Plaintiff MARK A. BROOKS-ALBRECHTSEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Second Amended Complaint)(DWH)
April 29, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal of Count II - Violation of the Civil Rights Act of 1964, filed by Plaintiff MARK A. BROOKS-ALBRECHTSEN. (DWH)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/21/2019 11:30 AM (Eastern Time) in room #243, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. Please bring a copy of this order with you to the conference. Failure to attend this pretrial conference may subject your case to dismissal (if a plaintiff) or default (if a defendant). See Order for additional information. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 4/26/2019.(SWM)
April 24, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to file reply in support of plaintiff's motion for the court to determine supplemental jurisdiction of plaintiff's pendent claim, filed by Plaintiff MARK A. BROOKS-ALBRECHTSEN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DWH)
April 12, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION For the Court to Determine Supplemental Jurisdiction of Plaintiff's Claim, filed by Defendants MATTHEW ADAMS, WILLARD BONTRAGER, COCA-COLA BOTTLING CO. CONSOLIDATED, INC., JAY JACKSON, KEITH JAEGER, AMY SOUERS, MANDI WALKER. (Wasser, Brent)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Brent D. Wasser for the defendants added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 4/9/2019 (dist made) (CBU)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Brent L. Wilson for all defendants added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 4/9/2019 (dist made) (CBU)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance. Attorney Philip L. Lu withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 4/9/2019 (dist made) (CBU)
April 3, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) (First Amended Complaint), filed by All Defendants.(Gessner, Jaclyn)
April 3, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants MATTHEW ADAMS, WILLARD BONTRAGER, COCA-COLA BOTTLING CO. CONSOLIDATED, INC., JAY JACKSON, KEITH JAEGER, AMY SOUERS, MANDI WALKER. (Gessner, Jaclyn)
April 3, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants MATTHEW ADAMS, WILLARD BONTRAGER, COCA-COLA BOTTLING CO. CONSOLIDATED, INC., JAY JACKSON, KEITH JAEGER, AMY SOUERS, MANDI WALKER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gessner, Jaclyn)
April 3, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Appearance of Philip L. Lu, filed by Defendants MATTHEW ADAMS, WILLARD BONTRAGER, COCA-COLA BOTTLING CO. CONSOLIDATED, INC., JAY JACKSON, KEITH JAEGER, AMY SOUERS, MANDI WALKER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gessner, Jaclyn)
April 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Brent D. Wasser to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5366715), filed by Defendants MATTHEW ADAMS, WILLARD BONTRAGER, COCA-COLA BOTTLING CO. CONSOLIDATED, INC., JAY JACKSON, KEITH JAEGER, AMY SOUERS, MANDI WALKER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Brent D. Wasser, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Prather, R.)
April 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Brent L. Wilson to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5366672), filed by Defendants MATTHEW ADAMS, WILLARD BONTRAGER, COCA-COLA BOTTLING CO. CONSOLIDATED, INC., JAY JACKSON, KEITH JAEGER, AMY SOUERS, MANDI WALKER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Brent L. Wilson, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Prather, R.)
March 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for the court to determine supplemental jurisdiction of plaintiff's pendent claim, filed by Plaintiff MARK A. BROOKS-ALBRECHTSEN. (DWH) Modified on 3/29/2019 (DWH).
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
March 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaclyn Susan Gessner on behalf of Defendants MATTHEW ADAMS, WILLARD BONTRAGER, COCA-COLA BOTTLING CO. CONSOLIDATED, INC., JAY JACKSON, KEITH JAEGER, AMY SOUERS, MANDI WALKER. (Gessner, Jaclyn)
March 27, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by COCA-COLA BOTTLING CO. CONSOLIDATED, INC.. (Prather, R.)
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Anthony Prather on behalf of Defendants MATTHEW ADAMS, WILLARD BONTRAGER, COCA-COLA BOTTLING CO. CONSOLIDATED, INC., JAY JACKSON, KEITH JAEGER, AMY SOUERS, MANDI WALKER. (Prather, R.)
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Joint-All Defendants) from Marion County Superior Court, case number 49D12-1806-PL-025447, filed by All Defendants. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5355670) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, #2 State Court Record (Docket, Complaint, Appearance for Plaintiff, Summonses, Returns of Service, Appearance for Defendants, Notice of Automatic Extension, Answer, Notice of Mediation, Report of Mediation, Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment-Affidavit-Memorandum, Plaintiffs Motion to File Amended Motion for Summary Judgment, Order Granting, Defendants Motion for Extension to Respond to Summary Judgment, Plaintiffs Objection to Motion for Extension, Order Granting Extension, Pro Hac Motions, Orders Granting Pro Hacs, Plaintiffs Motion to Certify Order, Order Denying Motion to Certify, Case Management Plan/Order, Motion to Withdraw Summary Judgment, Plaintiffs Witness & Exhibit Lists, Order Granting Motion to Withdraw, Plaintiffs Motion to Extend Deadline to Amend, Defendants Response, Order Granting Motion to Extend Deadline, Defendants Witness & Exhibit Lists, Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Complaint, Subpoena to Non-Party, Defendants Response to Motion to Amend, Order Granting Motion to Amend, Amended Complaint, Summonses for Souers-Jaeger-Jackson, Returns of Service-Souers-Jaeger-Jackson, Notice of Automatic Enlargement to Respond to Amended Complaint), #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Prather, R.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROOKS-ALBRECHTSEN v. COCA-COLA BOTTLING CO. CONSOLIDATED, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COCA-COLA BOTTLING CO. CONSOLIDATED, INC.
Represented By: Jaclyn Susan Gessner
Represented By: R. Anthony Prather
Represented By: Brent L. Wilson
Represented By: Philip L. Lu
Represented By: Brent D. Wasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MANDI WALKER
Represented By: Jaclyn Susan Gessner
Represented By: R. Anthony Prather
Represented By: Brent L. Wilson
Represented By: Philip L. Lu
Represented By: Brent D. Wasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAY JACKSON
Represented By: Jaclyn Susan Gessner
Represented By: R. Anthony Prather
Represented By: Brent L. Wilson
Represented By: Brent D. Wasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMY SOUERS
Represented By: Jaclyn Susan Gessner
Represented By: R. Anthony Prather
Represented By: Brent L. Wilson
Represented By: Brent D. Wasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW ADAMS
Represented By: Jaclyn Susan Gessner
Represented By: R. Anthony Prather
Represented By: Brent L. Wilson
Represented By: Philip L. Lu
Represented By: Brent D. Wasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLARD BONTRAGER
Represented By: Jaclyn Susan Gessner
Represented By: R. Anthony Prather
Represented By: Brent L. Wilson
Represented By: Philip L. Lu
Represented By: Brent D. Wasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEITH JAEGER
Represented By: Jaclyn Susan Gessner
Represented By: R. Anthony Prather
Represented By: Brent L. Wilson
Represented By: Brent D. Wasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK A. BROOKS-ALBRECHTSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?