BRADLEY CORPORATION v. LAWLER MANUFACTURING CO., INC.
Plaintiff: BRADLEY CORPORATION
Defendant: LAWLER MANUFACTURING CO., INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01240
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 SCHEDULING ORDER - Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/1/2020 02:00 PM in room #216, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge Sarah Evans Barker. Jury Trial set for 9/14/2020 09:30 AM in room #216, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge Sarah Evans Barker. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 7/10/2019. (CKM)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION for Protective Order , filed by Defendant LAWLER MANUFACTURING CO., INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - redline Protective Order, #2 Exhibit B - email string re efforts to resolve issue, #3 Exhibit C - Lawler Interrogatories to Bradley Nos 1-6, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Lueders, Daniel)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Entry from Discovery Conference - The parties, by counsel, appeared for a discovery conference on July 1, 2019, with the magistrate judge. The court heard arguments of counsel and provided some guidance. The parties will attempt to limit their dispute and brief only the issues they cannot resolve. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. (JLS)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 REPLY in Support of Motion re #37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re #30 Lawler's Amended Counterclaims , filed by Counter Defendants BRADLEY CORPORATION, BRADLEY CORPORATION, Plaintiff BRADLEY CORPORATION. (Malaney, Kevin)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 RESPONSE in Opposition re #37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re #30 Lawler's Amended Counterclaims , filed by Defendant LAWLER MANUFACTURING CO., INC.. (Lueders, Daniel)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of Discovery Dispute (Joint), filed by Plaintiff BRADLEY CORPORATION, re #40 Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Malaney, Kevin)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery Conference set for 7/1/2019 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/26/2019.(SWM)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant LAWLER MANUFACTURING CO., INC.. (Morris, Michael)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re #30 Lawler's Amended Counterclaims , filed by Counter Defendants BRADLEY CORPORATION, BRADLEY CORPORATION, Plaintiff BRADLEY CORPORATION. (Malaney, Kevin)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re #30 Lawler's Amended Counterclaims, filed by Counter Defendants BRADLEY CORPORATION, BRADLEY CORPORATION, Plaintiff BRADLEY CORPORATION. (Malaney, Kevin)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Counter Defendants BRADLEY CORPORATION, BRADLEY CORPORATION, Plaintiff BRADLEY CORPORATION. (Malaney, Kevin)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Regarding Discovery Disputes. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/7/2019.(SWM)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 3/27/2020. Discovery due by 1/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/3/2019.(SWM)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 EXHIBIT re #30 Answer to ComplaintCounterclaim Exhibit E to Amended Answer by All Defendants. (Lueders, Daniel)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Entry and Order from Initial Pretrial Conference - The parties, by counsel, appeared for an initial pretrial conference on May 24, 2019, with the magistrate judge. The case management plan submitted in this case is approved as modified by the magistrate judge in the margins of the case management plan. This case is set for a telephone status conference on August 19, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. (Eastern Time), with Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. (AKW)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction re #22 Lawler's Counterclaims MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re #22 Lawler's Counterclaims , filed by Defendant LAWLER MANUFACTURING CO., INC.. (Lueders, Daniel)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint And Affirmative Defenses, First COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs, filed by All Defendants.(Lueders, Daniel)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction re #22 Lawler's Counterclaims MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re #22 Lawler's Counterclaims , filed by Plaintiff BRADLEY CORPORATION, Counter Defendant BRADLEY CORPORATION. (Malaney, Kevin)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction re #22 Lawler's Counterclaims, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re #22 Lawler's Counterclaims, filed by Plaintiff BRADLEY CORPORATION, Counter Defendant BRADLEY CORPORATION. (Malaney, Kevin)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Joint CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff BRADLEY CORPORATION, Counter Defendant BRADLEY CORPORATION . (Malaney, Kevin)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Submission of Signature Requirement re #24 Reply in Support of Motion by BRADLEY CORPORATION. (Malaney, Kevin)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REPLY in Support of Motion re #21 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO DEPOSIT DISPUTED ROYALTY PAYMENTS WITH COURT , filed by Plaintiff BRADLEY CORPORATION, Counter Defendant BRADLEY CORPORATION. (Peters, Matthew)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO DEPOSIT DISPUTED ROYALTY PAYMENTS WITH COURT , filed by Defendant LAWLER MANUFACTURING CO., INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lueders, Daniel)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND, COUNTERCLAIM , COUNT I AND COUNT II, against BRADLEY CORPORATION, filed by LAWLER MANUFACTURING CO., INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - September 20, 2016 letter from Lawler to Bradley, #3 Exhibit B - May 25, 2011 letter from Bradley to Lawler, #4 Exhibit C - Bradleys NTS1 and NTS2, #5 Exhibit D - Bradleys warranty for its Navigator valves)(Lueders, Daniel)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO DEPOSIT DISPUTED ROYALTY PAYMENTS WITH COURT, filed by Plaintiff BRADLEY CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Prior Case Dkt No. 29 (Lawler first escrow motion), #2 Exhibit 2: Prior Case Dkt 31 (Order on Lawler first escrow motion), #3 Exhibit 3: Prior Case Dkt 93 (Lawler second escrow motion), #4 Exhibit 4: Prior Case Dkt 94 (Order on Lawler second escrow motion), #5 Exhibit 5: April 17, 2019 Lawler Letter, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Hart, Kathleen)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Kevin J. Malaney for BRADLEY CORPORATION added. The court FURTHER ORDERS that Kevin J. Malaney register as a user of the court's electronic case filing system by May 7, 2019. Failure to register could result in the revocation of his admission pro hac vice. Copy to Kevin J. Malaney via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 4/23/2019. (SWM)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Matthew W. Peters for BRADLEY CORPORATION added. The court FURTHER ORDERS that Matthew W. Peters register as a user of the court's electronic case filing system by May 7, 2 019. Failure to register could result in the revocation of his admission pro hac vice. Copy to Matthew W. Peters via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 4/23/2019. (SWM)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Jeffrey N. Costakos for BRADLEY CORPORATION added. The court FURTHER ORDERS that Jeffrey N. Costakos register as a user of the court's electronic case filing system by May 7, 2019. Failure to register could result in the revocation of his admission pro hac vice. Copy to Jeffrey N. Costakos via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 4/23/2019. (SWM)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Stephen E. Ferrucci hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Ferrucci, Stephen)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kevin J. Malaney to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5393467), filed by Plaintiff BRADLEY CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certification of Kevin J. Malaney in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hart, Kathleen)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Matthew W. Peters to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5393443), filed by Plaintiff BRADLEY CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certification of Matthew W. Peters in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hart, Kathleen)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jeffrey N. Costakos to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5393402), filed by Plaintiff BRADLEY CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certification of Jeffrey N. Costakos In Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hart, Kathleen)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen E. Ferrucci on behalf of Defendant LAWLER MANUFACTURING CO., INC.. (Ferrucci, Stephen)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/24/2019 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 4/18/2019.(SWM)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Kathleen I. Hart hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Hart, Kathleen)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael M. Morris on behalf of Defendant LAWLER MANUFACTURING CO., INC.. (Morris, Michael)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant LAWLER MANUFACTURING CO., INC.. (Lueders, Daniel)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LAWLER MANUFACTURING CO., INC.. (Lueders, Daniel)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel James Lueders on behalf of Defendant LAWLER MANUFACTURING CO., INC.. (Lueders, Daniel)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Lawler Manufacturing Co., Inc. on 04/01/19, filed by BRADLEY CORPORATION. (Hart, Kathleen)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to LAWLER MANUFACTURING CO., INC. (DJH)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen I. Hart on behalf of Plaintiff BRADLEY CORPORATION. (Hart, Kathleen)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BRADLEY CORPORATION. (Hart, Kathleen)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LAWLER MANUFACTURING CO., INC., filed by BRADLEY CORPORATION. Filing Fee $400.00 0756-5355658 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Settlement & License Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2-818 Patent, #3 Exhibit 3-Bradley Letter, #4 Exhibit 4-Lawler Letter, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons)(Hart, Kathleen) Modified on 3/27/2019 to add payment information (HET).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRADLEY CORPORATION v. LAWLER MANUFACTURING CO., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRADLEY CORPORATION
Represented By: Kathleen I. Hart
Represented By: Kevin J. Malaney
Represented By: Matthew W. Peters
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Costakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAWLER MANUFACTURING CO., INC.
Represented By: Michael M. Morris
Represented By: Stephen E. Ferrucci
Represented By: Daniel James Lueders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?