GREEN v. ASPEN DENTAL MANAGEMENT, INC., d/b/a ASPEN DENTAL

Plaintiff: NIKOLE GREEN
Defendant: ASPEN DENTAL MANAGEMENT, INC., d/b/a ASPEN DENTAL and ASPEN DENTAL MANAGEMENT, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01245
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ;Plaintiff Nikole Green and Defendant Aspen Dental Management, Inc. ("ADMI" or "Defendant"), improperly identified as Aspen Dental Management, Inc., d/b/a Aspen Dental, have filed their Joint Stipulation of Dismissal seeking dismissal of this matter with prejudice. The Court has examined the Stipulation and now finds that the matter should be dismissed. IT IS THEREFORE, ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that this matter is dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 6/4/2019. (CKM)
May 31, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint - With Prejudice, filed by Defendant ASPEN DENTAL MANAGEMENT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Black, Bianca)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting Defendant's #11 Motion for Continuance. Initial Pretrial Conference RESET for 6/14/2019 10:00 AM in room #234, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 5/7/2019.(SWM)
May 6, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of Pre-Trial Conference, filed by Defendant ASPEN DENTAL MANAGEMENT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Black, Bianca)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Claire B. Deason for ASPEN DENTAL MANAGEMENT, INC. added. Counsel shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-2(a), within 7 days. Copy to Claire B. Deason via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 5/3/2019. (SWM)
May 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to ASPEN DENTAL MANAGEMENT, INC.. (LAB) (CKM)
May 1, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , filed by ASPEN DENTAL MANAGEMENT, INC..(Black, Bianca)
May 1, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Claire B. Deason to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5408489), filed by Defendant ASPEN DENTAL MANAGEMENT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Claire B. Deason, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Black, Bianca)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/9/2019 02:00 PM in room #234, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 4/12/2019.(SWM)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 Submission of State Court Record from Johnson Superior Court 4 in case number 41D04-1903-PL-000032. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(REO)
March 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant ASPEN DENTAL MANAGEMENT, INC.. (Black, Bianca)
March 28, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE to Plaintiff of Notice of Removal, filed by Defendant ASPEN DENTAL MANAGEMENT, INC., d/b/a ASPEN DENTAL (Black, Bianca)
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Johnson County Superior Court, case number 41D04-1903-PL-000032, filed by ASPEN DENTAL MANAGEMENT, INC., d/b/a ASPEN DENTAL. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5355973) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record (Complaint, Appearance of Plaintiff's Counsel, Summons, Appearances of Defendant's Counsel, and Docket Sheet), #2 Exhibit B - State Court Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet)(Black, Bianca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREEN v. ASPEN DENTAL MANAGEMENT, INC., d/b/a ASPEN DENTAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASPEN DENTAL MANAGEMENT, INC., d/b/a ASPEN DENTAL
Represented By: Bianca Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASPEN DENTAL MANAGEMENT, INC.
Represented By: Bianca Black
Represented By: Claire B. Deason
Represented By: Alan L. McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NIKOLE GREEN
Represented By: Jay Meisenhelder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?