BELL v. HANA BUSINESS GROUP

Plaintiff: RICHARD N. BELL
Defendant: HANA BUSINESS GROUP
Case Number: 1:2019cv01249
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Richard N. Bell hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Bell, Richard)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 Alias Summons Issued as to HANA BUSINESS GROUP. (JRB)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to HANA BUSINESS GROUP. (Bell, Richard)
May 1, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to HANA BUSINESS GROUP. Signed by Clerk, Laura A. Briggs. Copy sent to counsel via US Mail (JRB)
April 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default , filed by Plaintiff RICHARD N. BELL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bell, Richard)
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by RICHARD N. BELL. HANA BUSINESS GROUP served on 4/1/2019. (Bell, Richard)
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to HANA BUSINESS GROUP. (JRB)
March 28, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
March 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JRB)
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard N. Bell on behalf of Plaintiff RICHARD N. BELL. (Bell, Richard)
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HANA BUSINESS GROUP, filed by RICHARD N. BELL. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5356096) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-COPYRIGHTED INDIANAPOLIS PHOTO, #2 Exhibit B-Infringement by Defendant Indianapolis cheappartybusdc.com, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Bell, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BELL v. HANA BUSINESS GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD N. BELL
Represented By: Richard N. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HANA BUSINESS GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?