BELL v. NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS

Plaintiff: RICHARD N. BELL
Defendant: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS
Case Number: 1:2019cv01262
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Final Determination in lawsuit sent to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Order on Unopposed Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice as to Defendant National Association of Realtors) (NAD)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ON UNOPPOSED MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS - The Plaintiff having filed a DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS which is not opposed by the Defendant, the Court finds this Motion should be granted. This Court Orders that the case be Dismissed against NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS with prejudice. This case is dismissed. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 4/24/2019.(NAD)
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Plaintiff RICHARD N. BELL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bell, Richard)
April 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - A-COPYRIGHTED INDIANAPOLIS PHOTO, #3 Exhibit B - B-Copy of Infringement by Defendant) (NAD)
March 29, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS. (DJH)
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard N. Bell on behalf of Plaintiff RICHARD N. BELL. (Bell, Richard)
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, filed by RICHARD N. BELL. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5357944) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-COPYRIGHTED INDIANAPOLIS PHOTO, #2 Exhibit B-Copy of Infringement by Defendant, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Bell, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BELL v. NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD N. BELL
Represented By: Richard N. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?