BUNNELL v. SAUL

Plaintiff: ANGINETTA BUNNELL
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL and ANDREW M. SAUL
Case Number: 1:2019cv01339
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ON ENLARGEMENT OF TIME - This cause is before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time. The Court being duly advised now GRANTS Plaintiff's motion. Accordingly, Plaintiff is granted an enlargement of time until July 30, 2019, to file the brief. No additional enlargements of time will be anticipated. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 6/26/2019. (JDC)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to July 30, 2019 to file Plaintiff's brief, filed by Plaintiff ANGINETTA BUNNELL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vrana, Timothy)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Plaintiff seeks judicial review of the defendant Commissioner's denial of Plaintiff's claim for Social Security benefits based on disability. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16, the Court now enters the following orders. ***SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION*** Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 6/4/2019.(JDC)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 TRANSCRIPT of Administrative Record of Social Security Administration, by NANCY A. BERRYHILL. (Attachments: #1 court transcript index, #2 administrative documents 6.5.17, #3 payment documents 6.5.17, #4 jurisdictional documents 6.5.17, #5 non disability related documents 6.5.17, #6 disability related documents 6.5.17, #7 medical records part 1 6.5.17, #8 medical records part 2 6.5.17, #9 medical records part 3 6.5.17, #10 administrative records 5.17.19, #11 payment documents 5.17.19, #12 jurisdictional documents 5.17.19, #13 non disability related documents 5.17.19, #14 disability related documents 5.17.19, #15 medical records part 1 5.17.19, #16 medical records part 2 5.17.19, #17 medical records part 3 5.17.19, #18 medical records part 4 5.17.19)(Wierenga, Julian)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Seagle on behalf of Defendant NANCY A. BERRYHILL. (Seagle, Catherine)
April 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Clifford Wierenga on behalf of Defendant NANCY A. BERRYHILL. (Wierenga, Julian)
April 4, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
April 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Vrana on behalf of Plaintiff ANGINETTA BUNNELL. (Vrana, Timothy)
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Review Decision of the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration against NANCY A. BERRYHILL, filed by ANGINETTA BUNNELL. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5364913) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vrana, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BUNNELL v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGINETTA BUNNELL
Represented By: Timothy J. Vrana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Represented By: Julian Clifford Wierenga
Represented By: Catherine Seagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?