MORGAN v. SAUL

Plaintiff: SHAWN D. MORGAN
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL and ANDREW M. SAUL
Case Number: 1:2019cv01366
Filed: April 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY ON BRIEFING SCHEDULE. See Entry. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 6/4/2019.(SWM)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 TRANSCRIPT of Administrative Record of Social Security Administration, by NANCY A. BERRYHILL. (Attachments: #1 court transcript index, #2 administrative documents part 1, #3 administrative documents part 2, #4 administrative documents part 3, #5 administrative documents part 4, #6 administrative documents part 5, #7 administrative documents part 6, #8 administrative documents part 7, #9 administrative documents part 8, #10 administrative documents part 9, #11 administrative documents part 10, #12 administrative documents part 11, #13 administrative documents part 12, #14 administrative documents part 13, #15 administrative documents part 14, #16 payment documents, #17 jurisdictional documents, #18 non disability related documents, #19 disability related documents, #20 medical records part 1, #21 medical records part 2, #22 medical records part 3, #23 medical records part 4, #24 medical records part 5, #25 medical records part 6)(Wierenga, Julian)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE - IT IS ORDERED: This case is referred to the currently assigned United States magistrate judge to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of a final judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73. Should this case be reassigned to a magistrate judge other than the magistrate judge assigned the date of this order, any attorney or party of record may object within 30 days of such reassignment. If no objection is filed, the consent will remain in effect. This action's case number SHALL be amended as shown above to reflect this referral to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 5/6/2019. (DWH)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 JOINT CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by NANCY A. BERRYHILL. (Wierenga, Julian)
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Clifford Wierenga on behalf of Defendant NANCY A. BERRYHILL. (Wierenga, Julian)
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
April 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirsten Elaine Wold on behalf of Plaintiff SHAWN D. MORGAN. (Wold, Kirsten)
April 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NANCY A. BERRYHILL, filed by SHAWN D. MORGAN. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5367290) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wold, Kirsten)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MORGAN v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Represented By: Julian Clifford Wierenga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAWN D. MORGAN
Represented By: Kirsten Elaine Wold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?