GILLESPIE v. A.R. BUILDING COMPANY

Plaintiff: MICHELLE GILLESPIE
Defendant: A.R. BUILDING COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv01403
Filed: April 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Doris L Pryor
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 RECEIPT #IP065566 for filing fee in the amount of $350, paid by Plaintiff. (REO)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - SEE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 6/5/2019.(JRB)
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal , filed by Plaintiff MICHELLE GILLESPIE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weldy, Ronald)
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of First Extension of Time to Respond to #1 Complaint , filed by Defendant A.R. BUILDING COMPANY. (Ritsema, Cameron) Modified on 5/24/2019 (JRB).
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by A.R. BUILDING COMPANY. (Ritsema, Cameron)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Emmanuel V.R. Boulukos on behalf of Defendant A.R. BUILDING COMPANY. (Boulukos, Emmanuel)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron Dean Ritsema on behalf of Defendant A.R. BUILDING COMPANY. (Ritsema, Cameron)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - SEE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 5/1/2019. (JRB)
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to A.R. BUILDING COMPANY. (JRB)
April 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Plaintiff MICHELLE GILLESPIE. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Forma Pauperis, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Weldy, Ronald)
April 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald E. Weldy on behalf of Plaintiff MICHELLE GILLESPIE. (Weldy, Ronald)
April 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against A.R. BUILDING COMPANY, filed by MICHELLE GILLESPIE. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Weldy, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GILLESPIE v. A.R. BUILDING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.R. BUILDING COMPANY
Represented By: Emmanuel V.R. Boulukos
Represented By: Cameron Dean Ritsema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELLE GILLESPIE
Represented By: Ronald E. Weldy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?