KOCHERT v. SAUL

Plaintiff: ALICE KOCHERT
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL and ANDREW M. SAUL
Case Number: 1:2019cv01425
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Within twenty-eight (28) days of this Order, Plaintiff shall file a brief in support of the complaint. Within twenty-eight (28) days after service of Plaintiff's brief, Defendant shall file a brief in response. Within fourteen (14) days after service of Defendant's opposition brief, Plaintiff will file his/her reply brief, if any. A failure to file a timely brief may result in a summary ruling at the close of the briefing period. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 6/13/2019.(NAD)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 TRANSCRIPT of Administrative Record of Social Security Administration, by ANDREW SAUL. (Attachments: #1 court transcript index, #2 administrative documents, #3 payment documents, #4 jurisdictional documents, #5 non disability related documents, #6 disability related documents part 1, #7 disability related documents part 2, #8 medical records part 1, #9 medical records part 2, #10 medical records part 3, #11 medical records part 4, #12 medical records part 5, #13 medical records part 6, #14 medical records part 7, #15 medical records part 8, #16 medical records part 9, #17 medical records part 10, #18 medical records part 11, #19 medical records part 12, #20 medical records part 13, #21 medical records part 14, #22 medical records part 15, #23 medical records part 16)(Wierenga, Julian)
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Clifford Wierenga on behalf of Defendant NANCY A. BERRYHILL. (Wierenga, Julian)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
April 10, 2019 (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) CLERK'S NOTICE - Pursuant to Local Rule 5-12(a), and by agreement with the United States Attorney, no actual service of initial process is required in Social Security appeals brought in the United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana, unless otherwise ordered. The Social Security Administration will treat notification through the Court's Case Management and Electronic Filing System (CM/ECF) as service under Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Therefore, the Clerk's Office will refrain from issuance of the submitted summons(es) unless otherwise ordered. (TEXT-ENTRY: There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) (HET)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonelle L. Redelman on behalf of Plaintiff ALICE KOCHERT. (Redelman, Jonelle)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NANCY A. BERRYHILL, filed by ALICE KOCHERT. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5374246) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Redelman, Jonelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KOCHERT v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALICE KOCHERT
Represented By: Jonelle L. Redelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Represented By: Julian Clifford Wierenga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?