SHAE v. LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff: PATRICIA DONZE SHAE
Defendant: THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY and LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv01442
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS SUBMITTED. Initial Pre-Trial Conference held 7/3/2019. Discovery due by 1/31/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 2/19/2020. Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/16/2019 at 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 7/3/2019.(LES)
June 25, 2019 Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY . (Cramer, Ruth)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Ruth A. Cramer on behalf of Defendant LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Cramer, Ruth)
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Bridget L. O'Ryan on behalf of Plaintiff PATRICIA DONZE SHAE. (O'Ryan, Bridget)
May 14, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , filed by LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY.(Mathisen, Eric)
May 2, 2019 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Plaintiff PATRICIA DONZE SHAE. (Rosenbaum, William)
April 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, William T. Rosenbaum hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Rosenbaum, William)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 7/3/2019 at 11:00 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 4/12/2019.(JRB)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Mathisen, Eric)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent LINCOLN NATIONAL CORPORATION for THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY.. (Mathisen, Eric)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric P. Mathisen on behalf of Defendant THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Mathisen, Eric)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion Superior Court, Div. 7, case number 49D07-1903-PL-010904, filed by THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5376066) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, state court record, #2 Exhibit B, Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to be filed in the state court action, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mathisen, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHAE v. LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Eric P. Mathisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Eric P. Mathisen
Represented By: Ruth A. Cramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA DONZE SHAE
Represented By: Bridget L. O'Ryan
Represented By: William T. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?