UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $85,270.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $85,270.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Interested Party: STEVEN CASADOS
Case Number: 1:2019cv01461
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER - Bench Trial set for 9/14/2020 09:30 AM in room #216, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge Sarah Evans Barker. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/1/2020 02:00 PM in room #216, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge Sarah Evans Barker. (CKM)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Continuance-TELEPHONIC Status Conference reset for 8/16/2019 at 10:30 AM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. All other requirements on the Court's Order dated 6/19/2019 #15 remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 7/9/2019.(CBU)
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 First MOTION for Continuance Telephonic Conference, filed by Interested Party STEVEN CASADOS. (Patel, Rahul)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 12/6/2019. Discovery due by 10/28/2019. *SEE ALL DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 6/19/2019. (GD)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Status Conference held on 6/19/2019. Approved Case Management Plan, as amended, to be entered by separate order. Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/17/2019 at 9:00 AM (Eastern Time). Settlement Conference set for 10/3/2019 at 9:00 AM (Eastern Time) in room #257, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana. *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDERS. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 6/19/2019.(SWM)
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 Proposed CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA . (Babbs, Eric)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 Submission of Claim, filed by Interested Party STEVEN CASADOS. (Patel, Rahul)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint #1 , filed by Interested Party STEVEN CASADOS. (Patel, Rahul) Modified on 5/28/2019 (CKM).
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Rahul B Patel on behalf of Interested Party STEVEN CASADOS. (Patel, Rahul)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting Defendant's #6 Motion to Continue. Mr. Carter shall file any verified claim and response to the United States' Complaint on or before June 17, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 5/10/2019. (SWM)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/19/2019 01:30 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. The purpose of the conference is to discuss case status. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 5/10/2019.(SWM)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION for Continuance , filed by Defendant $85,270.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY. (Patel, Rahul)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Rahul B Patel on behalf of Defendant $85,270.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY. (Patel, Rahul)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR WARRANT for Arrest of Property. Issued by the Clerk on 4/12/2019. Paper copies to USM.(CKM)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Parker Babbs on behalf of Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Babbs, Eric)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT OF FORFEITURE IN REM against $85,270.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Warrant for Arrest of Property)(Babbs, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $85,270.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $85,270.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Represented By: Rahul B Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Eric Parker Babbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: STEVEN CASADOS
Represented By: Rahul B Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?