FALZONE v. SAUL

Plaintiff: LOUIE C. FALZONE
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL and ANDREW M. SAUL
Case Number: 1:2019cv01462
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Doris L Pryor
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 Brief in Support of Complaint for Review by LOUIE C. FALZONE. (Wold, Kirsten)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Plaintiff seeks judicial review of the defendant Commissioner's denial of Plaintiff's claim for Social Security benefits based on disability. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16, the Court now enters the following orders. ***SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION*** Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 6/11/2019.(JDC)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 TRANSCRIPT of Administrative Record of Social Security Administration, by NANCY A. BERRYHILL. (Attachments: #1 court transcript index, #2 administrative documents, #3 payment documents, #4 jurisdictional documents part 1, #5 jurisdictional documents part 2, #6 non disability related documents, #7 disability related documents, #8 medical records part 1, #9 medical records part 2, #10 medical records part 3, #11 medical records part 4, #12 medical records part 5, #13 medical records part 6, #14 medical records part 7, #15 medical records part 8, #16 medical records part 9, #17 medical records part 10, #18 medical records part 11, #19 medical records part 12, #20 medical records part 13, #21 medical records part 14, #22 medical records part 15, #23 medical records part 16, #24 medical records part 17, #25 medical records part 18, #26 medical records part 19)(Wierenga, Julian)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Clifford Wierenga on behalf of Defendant NANCY A. BERRYHILL. (Wierenga, Julian)
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Clifford Wierenga on behalf of Defendant NANCY A. BERRYHILL. (Wierenga, Julian)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirsten Elaine Wold on behalf of Plaintiff LOUIE C. FALZONE. (Wold, Kirsten)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NANCY A. BERRYHILL, filed by LOUIE C. FALZONE. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5377699) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wold, Kirsten)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FALZONE v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOUIE C. FALZONE
Represented By: Kirsten Elaine Wold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Represented By: Julian Clifford Wierenga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?