INDIE GAME STUDIOS, LLC v. PLAN B GAMES, INC., et al.
Plaintiff: INDIE GAME STUDIOS, LLC d/b/a STRONGHOLD GAMES LLC and INDIE GAME STUDIOS, LLC
Defendant: Plan B Games, Inc. and Plan B Games Europe GmbH, PLAN B GAMES EUROPE GMBH and PLAN B GAMES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01492
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE of Final Determination in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Order of Dismissal) (CKM)
January 30, 2020 Filing 50 CLOSED DISMISSED with prejudice is Acknowledged. This action is hereby dismissed with prejudice (marginal). Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 1/30/2020.(CBU)
January 24, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated with Prejudice, filed by Plaintiff INDIE GAME STUDIOS, LLC. (Olmstead, Patrick)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Settlement Conference held on 12/11/2019. This matter has been resolved. Therefore, all pending motions are now DENIED AS MOOT & all previously ordered dates are VACATED. Within 30 days of date of this entry, parties shall file for dismissal. *SEE ORDER.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD)
December 9, 2019 Filing 47 REPORT Joint Report on Status of Discovery by INDIE GAME STUDIOS, LLC. (Bradshaw, John)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/8/2019. Parties discussed status of & readiness for upcoming settlement conference. Conference concluded without further order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 SCHEDULING ORDER - Jury Trial set for 3/15/2021 09:30 AM in room #216, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge Sarah Evans Barker. Pretrial Conference set for 3/2/2021 02:00 PM in room #216, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge Sarah Evans Barker. (CKM)
October 18, 2019 Filing 43 Exhibit List DEFENDANTS PRELIMINARY WITNESS & EXHIBIT LIST, filed by Defendants PLAN B GAMES EUROPE GMBH, PLAN B GAMES, INC.. (Ehrlich, Burton)
October 17, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Answer in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Answer to Complaint) (CKM)
October 11, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures , filed by Defendants PLAN B GAMES EUROPE GMBH, PLAN B GAMES, INC.. (Ehrlich, Burton)
October 11, 2019 Filing 40 Exhibit List , filed by Plaintiff INDIE GAME STUDIOS, LLC, Witness List , filed by Plaintiff INDIE GAME STUDIOS, LLC. (Olmstead, Patrick)
October 11, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures , filed by Plaintiff INDIE GAME STUDIOS, LLC. (Olmstead, Patrick)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 6/12/2020. Discovery due by 5/15/2020. *SEE ALL DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/3/2019. (GD)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SCHEDULING ORDER: In order to allow the Court to more efficiently and effectively manage discovery in this matter, on or before December 9, 2019, the parties shall jointly file a "Joint Report on the Status of Discovery," which report shall set forth (SEE ORDER). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/3/2019.(SWM)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/2/2019. Approved Case Management Plan, as amended, to be entered by separate order. Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/8/2019 at 10:30 AM (Eastern Time). Settlement Conference set for 12/11/2019 at 9:00 AM (Eastern Time) in room #257, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana. *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDERS. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/2/2019.(SWM)
September 27, 2019 Filing 33 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff INDIE GAME STUDIOS, LLC . (Bradshaw, John)
September 27, 2019 Filing 32 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by PLAN B GAMES EUROPE GMBH, PLAN B GAMES, INC..(Ehrlich, Burton)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Burton S. Ehrlich for PLAN B GAMES EUROPE GMBH and PLAN B GAMES, INC. added. If not already registered with the Court's Electronic Filing System, Burton S. Ehrlich is ordered to register within ten (10) days of the entry of this order. Copy to Burton S. Ehrlich via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/5/2019. (SWM)
August 30, 2019 Filing 30 RECEIPT #IP066440 for Pro hac vice fee in the amount of $100.00, re Dkt. #29 , paid by Burton S. Ehrlich. (NAD) (NAD). Modified on 9/5/2019 - Edited filing date to 8/30/19(NAD).
August 29, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Attorney(s) Burton S. Ehrlich to Appear pro hac vice (No fee paid with this filing), filed by Defendants PLAN B GAMES EUROPE GMBH, PLAN B GAMES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Burton Ehlrich, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Seymour, Darlene)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting Defendants' #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 9/27/2019. No further enlargement of this deadline will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/21/2019. (SWM)
August 21, 2019 Filing 27 MARGINAL ENTRY re #19 Notice of Withdrawal of DE 16 and DE 17. ACKNOWLEDGED. In light of Plaintiff's Notice of Withdrawal of DE 16 and DE17 [Dkt. 19], Plaintiff's Motion for Permission to Serve Defendants Through Alternative Means Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(F)(3) [Dkt. #16 ] is hereby DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/21/2019. (SWM)
August 21, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Darlene R. Seymour hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Seymour, Darlene)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/2/2019 04:30 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") on or before September 30, 2019. Section III(A) through (E) of the proposed CMP shall include the following deadlines (see Order for established deadlines and additional information). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/20/2019.(SWM)
August 20, 2019 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PLAN B GAMES, INC. (Seymour, Darlene) Modified on 8/21/2019 (CKM).
August 20, 2019 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PLAN B GAMES EUROPE GMBH (Seymour, Darlene) Modified on 8/21/2019 (CKM).
August 19, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to PLAN B GAMES EUROPE GMBH, PLAN B GAMES, INC. (LAB) (CKM)
August 19, 2019 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to September 27, 2019 in which to #1 Complaint File Responsive Pleading, filed by Defendants PLAN B GAMES EUROPE GMBH, PLAN B GAMES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order granting extension of time)(Seymour, Darlene) Modified on 8/20/2019 (CKM).
August 19, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Darlene R. Seymour on behalf of Defendants PLAN B GAMES EUROPE GMBH, PLAN B GAMES, INC.. (Seymour, Darlene)
August 5, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DE 16 AND DE 17, filed by Plaintiff INDIE GAME STUDIOS, LLC, re #17 Brief/Memorandum in Support, #16 MOTION SERVE DEFENDANTS THROUGH ALTERNATIVE MEANS. (Olmstead, Patrick)
August 5, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Sophie Gravel on 8-2-19, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Proof of Service, #2 Affidavit Proof of Service)(Olmstead, Patrick)
July 24, 2019 Filing 17 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #16 MOTION SERVE DEFENDANTS THROUGH ALTERNATIVE MEANS , filed by Plaintiff INDIE GAME STUDIOS, LLC. (Olmstead, Patrick)
July 24, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION SERVE DEFENDANTS THROUGH ALTERNATIVE MEANS, filed by Plaintiff INDIE GAME STUDIOS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olmstead, Patrick)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Effect Service of Process. [Dkt. #14 .] The Court, being duly advised, hereby GRANTS the motion. The time for Plaintiff to effect service of process upon Defendants is hereby enlarged to and including August 26, 2019. In light of this Order, Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Effect Service of Process [Dkt. #13 ] is hereby DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 7/16/2019. (SWM)
July 12, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to August 26, 2019 , filed by Plaintiff INDIE GAME STUDIOS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olmstead, Patrick)
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to August 26, 2019 , filed by Plaintiff INDIE GAME STUDIOS, LLC. (Olmstead, Patrick)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by INDIE GAME STUDIOS, LLC. (Bradshaw, John)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to INDIE GAME STUDIOS, LLC. (LAB) (CKM)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John Michael Bradshaw on behalf of Plaintiff INDIE GAME STUDIOS, LLC. (Bradshaw, John)
May 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (CKM)
April 19, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to PLAN B GAMES, INC. & PLAN GAMES EUROPE GMBH on 04/22/19, filed by Plaintiff INDIE GAME STUDIOS, LLC. (Olmstead, Patrick)
April 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Request for Waiver of Service for Summons Supplied by INDIE GAME STUDIOS, LLC. (Olmstead, Patrick)
April 19, 2019 Filing 6 Submission of Signature Requirement re #1 Complaint by INDIE GAME STUDIOS, LLC. (Olmstead, Patrick)
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Patrick James Olmstead, Jr hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Olmstead, Patrick)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summonses Issued as to PLAN B GAMES EUROPE GMBH and PLAN B GAMES, INC. (DJH)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick James Olmstead, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff INDIE GAME STUDIOS, LLC d/b/a STRONGHOLD GAMES LLC. (Olmstead, Patrick)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Plan B Games, Inc. and Plan B Games Europe GmbH, filed by INDIE GAME STUDIOS, LLC d/b/a STRONGHOLD GAMES LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5381598) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Olmstead, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INDIE GAME STUDIOS, LLC v. PLAN B GAMES, INC., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plan B Games, Inc. and Plan B Games Europe GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLAN B GAMES EUROPE GMBH
Represented By: Darlene R. Seymour
Represented By: Burton S. Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLAN B GAMES, INC.
Represented By: Darlene R. Seymour
Represented By: Burton S. Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INDIE GAME STUDIOS, LLC d/b/a STRONGHOLD GAMES LLC
Represented By: Patrick James Olmstead, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INDIE GAME STUDIOS, LLC
Represented By: Patrick James Olmstead, Jr.
Represented By: John Michael Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?