JONES v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA

Plaintiff: RHONDA JONES
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv01494
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 Proposed CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff RHONDA JONES . (Marks, Ashley)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #11 Motion for Continuance. Initial Pretrial Conference RESET for 7/9/2019 10:30 AM in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 6/12/2019.(SWM)
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA.(Kalas, Jennifer)
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pretrial Conference, filed by Plaintiff RHONDA JONES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marks, Ashley)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/2/2019 09:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. The parties themselves may participate at their option. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 6/5/2019.(SWM)
May 1, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by RHONDA JONES. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA served on 4/22/2019. (Marks, Ashley)
April 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (Kalas, Jennifer)
April 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Jay Kalas on behalf of Defendant LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (Kalas, Jennifer)
April 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Keenan Ryan on behalf of Defendant LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (Ryan, Daniel)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (DJH)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa A. Davidson on behalf of Plaintiff RHONDA JONES. (Davidson, Melissa)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley D. Marks on behalf of Plaintiff RHONDA JONES. (Marks, Ashley)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA, filed by RHONDA JONES. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5381881) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Marks, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JONES v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Represented By: Daniel Keenan Ryan
Represented By: Jennifer Jay Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RHONDA JONES
Represented By: Ashley D. Marks
Represented By: Melissa A. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?