RICHARDSON v. RASULOV et al
Plaintiff: KEVIN RICHARDSON
Defendant: AMAZON.COM, INC., PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO., L.P., PREMIER TRAILER LEASING, INC, DILSHOD RASULOV, XPRESS TRUCKING LLC, XPO LAST MILE, INC, AMAZON FULLFILLMENT SERVICES, INC. and AMAZON LOGISTICS, INC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01549
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 35 Statement of Citizenship, Supplemental, by PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO., L.P.. (Eberwine, Eric)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER to Supplement Statement of Citizenship to Defendant Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. Penske is ORDERED to file a Supplemental Statement of Citizenship by June 17, 2019, that properly details its citizenship. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/10/2019.(SWM)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Regarding Discovery Disputes. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/7/2019.(SWM)
June 7, 2019 Filing 32 Statement of Citizenship by PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO., L.P.. (Eberwine, Eric)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE to Defendant Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P.: Defendant Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE regarding its citizenship. Penske Truck has provided the court with inconsistent information about its entity form and insufficient information about its citizenship. In its disclosure statement (Dkt. 17), Penske Truck states it is a Delaware corporation. In its answer (Dkt. 15, 5) to the plaintiff's amended complaint, Penske Truck states it is a limited partnership (as its name suggests).Penske Truck must file a statement of citizenship by June 11, 2019, See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/5/2019.(SWM)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 4/18/2020. Discovery due by 2/18/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/5/2019.(SWM)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Entry and Order from Initial Pretrial Conference - The parties, by counsel, appeared for an initial pretrial conference on May 30, 2019, with the magistrate judge. The case management plan submitted in this case is approved as modified by the magistrate judge in the margins of the case management plan. This case is set for a telephone status conference on August 20, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. (Eastern), with Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. (JLS)
May 31, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Lee Tyler on behalf of Defendants AMAZON FULLFILLMENT SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM, INC.. (Tyler, Scott)
May 31, 2019 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMAZON FULLFILLMENT SERVICES, INC.. (Eberwine, Eric)
May 31, 2019 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMAZON.COM, INC.. (Eberwine, Eric)
May 31, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand , filed by AMAZON FULLFILLMENT SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM, INC..(Eberwine, Eric)
May 31, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Thomas Eberwine on behalf of Defendants AMAZON FULLFILLMENT SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM, INC.. (Eberwine, Eric)
May 30, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand , filed by XPO LAST MILE, INC.(Foos, Robert) Modified on 5/31/2019 (NAD).
May 22, 2019 Filing 21 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff KEVIN RICHARDSON . (Tate, Brandon)
May 22, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Kevin Michael Bowen hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Bowen, Kevin)
May 13, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Lee Tyler on behalf of Defendants AMAZON LOGISTICS, INC, PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO., L.P., DILSHOD RASULOV, XPRESS TRUCKING LLC. (Tyler, Scott)
May 13, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by XPRESS TRUCKING LLC. (Eberwine, Eric)
May 13, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO., L.P.. (Eberwine, Eric)
May 13, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMAZON LOGISTICS, INC. (Eberwine, Eric)
May 13, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand , filed by PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO., L.P..(Eberwine, Eric) Modified on 5/14/2019 (NAD).
May 13, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Thomas Eberwine on behalf of Defendants AMAZON LOGISTICS, INC, PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO., L.P., DILSHOD RASULOV, XPRESS TRUCKING LLC. (Eberwine, Eric)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/30/2019 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 4/25/2019.(SWM)
April 23, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PREMIER TRAILER LEASING, INC. (Cole, Aimee)
April 23, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand , filed by PREMIER TRAILER LEASING, INC.(Cole, Aimee) Modified on 4/24/2019 (NAD).
April 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Aimee Rivera Cole on behalf of Defendant PREMIER TRAILER LEASING, INC. (Cole, Aimee)
April 22, 2019 Filing 9 Jurisdictional Statement , Supplemental, re #8 Entry by XPO LAST MILE, INC. (Foos, Robert)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENTRY ON JURISDICTION - It has come to the Court's attention that Defendant's Notice of Removal fails to allege all of the facts necessary to determine whether this Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this case. The Notice of Removal alleges that this Court has jurisdiction based upon diversity of citizenship. However, the Notice of Removal fails to sufficiently allege the citizenship of one Defendant. Therefore, the Defendant XPO Last Mile, Inc. d/b/a XPO Logistics is ORDERED to file a Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement that establishes the Court's jurisdiction over this case. This statement should specifically identify the members of the limited liability company and those members' citizenship. This jurisdictional statement is due fourteen (14) days from the date of this Entry. (See Entry.) Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 4/22/2019.(NAD)
April 19, 2019 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
April 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant XPO LAST MILE, INC. (Foos, Robert)
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Defendant XPO LAST MILE, INC. (Foos, Robert)
April 18, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by XPO LAST MILE, INC identifying Corporate Parent XPO LOGISTICS, INC. for XPO LAST MILE, INC.. (Foos, Robert)
April 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Lee English on behalf of Defendant XPO LAST MILE, INC. (English, Katherine)
April 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert R. Foos on behalf of Defendant XPO LAST MILE, INC. (Foos, Robert)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Superior Court, case number 49D06-1712-CT-45956, filed by XPO LAST MILE, INC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5389467) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Second Amended Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 State Court Record)(Foos, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RICHARDSON v. RASULOV et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN RICHARDSON
Represented By: Kevin Michael Bowen
Represented By: John Thomas Funk
Represented By: Ann Marie Waldron
Represented By: Brandon Eric Tate
Represented By: Benjamin Albert Spandau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON.COM, INC.
Represented By: Scott Lee Tyler
Represented By: Eric Thomas Eberwine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO., L.P.
Represented By: Scott Lee Tyler
Represented By: Eric Thomas Eberwine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PREMIER TRAILER LEASING, INC
Represented By: Aimee Rivera Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DILSHOD RASULOV
Represented By: Scott Lee Tyler
Represented By: Eric Thomas Eberwine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPRESS TRUCKING LLC
Represented By: Scott Lee Tyler
Represented By: Eric Thomas Eberwine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPO LAST MILE, INC
Represented By: Katherine Lee English
Represented By: Robert R. Foos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON FULLFILLMENT SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Scott Lee Tyler
Represented By: Eric Thomas Eberwine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON LOGISTICS, INC
Represented By: Scott Lee Tyler
Represented By: Eric Thomas Eberwine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?