INDIANA FARM BUREAU INSURANCE v. AMAZON.COM, INC. et al

Plaintiff: INDIANA FARM BUREAU INSURANCE
Defendant: AMAZON.COM, INC., GUANGDONG FEILUN TECHNOLOGY INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. and SOWOFA US STORE
Case Number: 1:2019cv01568
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) , filed by Plaintiff INDIANA FARM BUREAU INSURANCE. (Cobourn-Baurley, Michelle)
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) , filed by Defendant AMAZON.COM, INC.. (Jankowski, Matthew)
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6), filed by Defendant AMAZON.COM, INC.. (Jankowski, Matthew)
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Amazon.com, Inc. on April 30, 2019, filed by INDIANA FARM BUREAU INSURANCE. (Cobourn-Baurley, Michelle)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Defendant's #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File answer to complaint to 6/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 5/20/20/19. (SWM)
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to June 20, 2019 in which to #1 Complaint Answer, filed by Defendant AMAZON.COM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jankowski, Matthew)
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Jankowski on behalf of Defendant AMAZON.COM, INC.. (Jankowski, Matthew)
April 23, 2019 Filing 7 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC)
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
April 22, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to AMAZON.COM, INC., GUANGDONG FEILUN TECHNOLOGY INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD., SOWOFA US STORE. (REO)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron A. Morgan on behalf of Plaintiff INDIANA FARM BUREAU INSURANCE. (Morgan, Cameron)
April 19, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by INDIANA FARM BUREAU INSURANCE. (Cobourn-Baurley, Michelle)
April 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle A. Cobourn-Baurley on behalf of Plaintiff INDIANA FARM BUREAU INSURANCE. (Cobourn-Baurley, Michelle)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by INDIANA FARM BUREAU INSURANCE. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5390217) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Cobourn-Baurley, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INDIANA FARM BUREAU INSURANCE v. AMAZON.COM, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON.COM, INC.
Represented By: Matthew J. Jankowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GUANGDONG FEILUN TECHNOLOGY INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOWOFA US STORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INDIANA FARM BUREAU INSURANCE
Represented By: Cameron A. Morgan
Represented By: Michelle A. Cobourn-Baurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?