BELL v. CISION US, INC.
Plaintiff: RICHARD N. BELL
Defendant: CISION US, INC. and BLAZE BRANDING GROUP INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01587
Filed: April 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by RICHARD N. BELL. BLAZE BRANDING GROUP INC. served on 5/13/2019. (Bell, Richard)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ON UNOPPOSED MOTION TO DISMISS AS TO DEFENDANT CISION US, INC - This Court Orders that the case be Dismissed against CISION US, INC. This case shall continue as to Defendant BLAZE BRANDING GROUP INC. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 5/9/2019.(JRB)
May 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Amended Complaint in lawsuit sent to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JRB)
May 8, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to BLAZE BRANDING GROUP INC. (JRB)
May 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Plaintiff RICHARD N. BELL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bell, Richard)
May 7, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to BLAZE BRANDING GROUP INC.. (Bell, Richard)
May 7, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BLAZE BRANDING GROUP INC., filed by RICHARD N. BELL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-COPYRIGHTED INDIANAPOLIS PHOTO, #2 Exhibit B-SCREENSHOT OF INFRINGEMENT, #3 Exhibit C-SCREENSHOT OF INFRINGEMENT, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bell, Richard)
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JRB)
April 22, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TMB)
April 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CISION US, INC.. (TMB)
April 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard N. Bell on behalf of Plaintiff RICHARD N. BELL. (Bell, Richard)
April 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CISION US, INC., filed by RICHARD N. BELL. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5391709) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Copyrighted Indianapolis Photo, #2 Exhibit B-Screenshot of Infringement, #3 Exhibit C-Screenshot of Infringement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons)(Bell, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BELL v. CISION US, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD N. BELL
Represented By: Richard N. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CISION US, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLAZE BRANDING GROUP INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?