BELL v. JM BULLION, INC.
Plaintiff: RICHARD N. BELL
Defendant: JM BULLION, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01636
Filed: April 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CLOSED DISMISSED. ORDER ON UNOPPOSED MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICEAS TO DEFENDANT JM BULLION, INC - The Plaintiff having filed a DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF JM BULLION, INC which is not opposed by the Defendant, the Court finds this Motion should be granted. This Court Orders that the case be Dismissed against JM BULLION, INC with prejudice. This case is dismissed. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 5/6/2019. (JDC)
May 3, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal against JM BULLION, INC., filed by Plaintiff RICHARD N. BELL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bell, Richard)
April 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A&B) (JDC) Modified on 4/25/2019 (JDC). (Main Document 6 replaced on 4/25/2019) (JDC). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/25/2019: #2 complaint) (JDC).
April 25, 2019 Filing 5 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC)
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to JM BULLION, INC. (REO)
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard N. Bell on behalf of Plaintiff RICHARD N. BELL. (Bell, Richard)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JM BULLION, INC., filed by RICHARD N. BELL. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5395015) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Copyrighted Indianapolis Photo, #2 Exhibit B-Copy of Defendant's Infringement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Bell, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BELL v. JM BULLION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD N. BELL
Represented By: Richard N. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JM BULLION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?