DOE et al v. USA GYMNASTICS, INC. et al

Plaintiff: KELLY CUTRIGHT, M DOE and M. DOE
Defendant: NATIONAL GYMNASTICS FOUNDATION, USA GYMNASTICS, INC., SHARP'S GYMNASTICS ACADEMY, THE ESTATE OF MARVIN SHARP, ROE FOUNDATIONS 1-1000, WILLIAM MCCABE, SAVANNAH METRO, INC. and USA GYMNASTICS
Case Number: 1:2019cv01716
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGED DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE to USA Gymnastics and The NationalGymnastics Foundation ONLY. - NATIONAL GYMNASTICS FOUNDATION and USA GYMNASTICS terminated. (MARGINAL ENTRY) Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 5/3/2019.(JDC)
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Plaintiffs KELLY CUTRIGHT, M. DOE. (Little, Jonathan)
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC)
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to WILLIAM MCCABE, NATIONAL GYMNASTICS FOUNDATION, ROE FOUNDATIONS 1-1000, SAVANNAH METRO, INC., SHARP'S GYMNASTICS ACADEMY, THE ESTATE OF MARVIN SHARP, USA GYMNASTICS. (REO)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Charles Little on behalf of Plaintiffs KELLY CUTRIGHT, M DOE. (Little, Jonathan)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Class Action) against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5403467) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Little, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOE et al v. USA GYMNASTICS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL GYMNASTICS FOUNDATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA GYMNASTICS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHARP'S GYMNASTICS ACADEMY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE ESTATE OF MARVIN SHARP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROE FOUNDATIONS 1-1000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM MCCABE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAVANNAH METRO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA GYMNASTICS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KELLY CUTRIGHT
Represented By: Jonathan Charles Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M DOE
Represented By: Jonathan Charles Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. DOE
Represented By: Jonathan Charles Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?