ANNIE OAKLEY ENTERPRISES, INC. et al v. RISE N SHINE ONLINE LLC et al

Plaintiff: RENEE GABET and ANNIE OAKLEY ENTERPRISES INC.
Defendant: RISE N SHINE ONLINE LLC, ERIC YOUNG and E & E PREMIER DISTRIBUTORS
Case Number: 1:2019cv01732
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 - Screenshot of Annie Oakley Enterprises, Inc. Rise N Shine Custom Ble, #3 Exhibit 2 - USPTO Registration No. 2,549,750: RISE N SHINE, #4 Exhibit 3 - USPTO Registration No. 3,990,283: RISE N SHINE, #5 Exhibit 4 - Compilation of Rise N Shine sample webpages of infringing products, #6 Exhibit 5 - USPTO Trademark Office Action mailed to Rise N Shine Online LLC 9/1/, #7 Exhibit 6 - USPTO Notice of Abandonment re: Rise N Shine Online dated March 30,) (JDH)
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
May 1, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to RISE N SHINE ONLINE LLC, ERIC YOUNG. (MAC)
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAC)
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by April M. Jay on behalf of Plaintiffs ANNIE OAKLEY ENTERPRISES INC., RENEE GABET. (Jay, April)
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ANNIE OAKLEY ENTERPRISES INC.. (Overhauser, Paul)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul B. Overhauser on behalf of Plaintiffs ANNIE OAKLEY ENTERPRISES INC., RENEE GABET. (Overhauser, Paul)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RISE N SHINE ONLINE LLC and ERIC YOUNG filed by RENEE GABET, ANNIE OAKLEY ENTERPRISES INC.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5404812) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Screenshot of Annie Oakley Enterprises, Inc. Rise N Shine Custom Blend, #2 Exhibit 2 - USPTO Registration No. 2,549,750: RISE N SHINE, #3 Exhibit 3 - USPTO Registration No. 3,990,283: RISE N SHINE, #4 Exhibit 4 - Compilation of Rise N Shine sample webpages of infringing products, #5 Exhibit 5 - USPTO Trademark Office Action mailed to Rise N Shine Online LLC 9/1/2016, #6 Exhibit 6 - USPTO Notice of Abandonment re: Rise N Shine Online dated March 30, 2017., #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Proposed Summons)(Overhauser, Paul) Modified on 4/30/2019 (party selection per phone call from filer) (DJH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ANNIE OAKLEY ENTERPRISES, INC. et al v. RISE N SHINE ONLINE LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RISE N SHINE ONLINE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E & E PREMIER DISTRIBUTORS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RENEE GABET
Represented By: April M. Jay
Represented By: Paul B. Overhauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNIE OAKLEY ENTERPRISES INC.
Represented By: April M. Jay
Represented By: Paul B. Overhauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?