TRADE DESIGN STUDIO LLC v. 1824 CARROLLTON LLC et al
Plaintiff: TRADE DESIGN STUDIO LLC
Defendant: T.A.K.E. 3 INVESTMENTS LLC, 1824 CARROLLTON LLC and TENA ALLEN
Case Number: 1:2019cv01770
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Complaint to 7/11/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 6/19/2019. (JRB)
June 18, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to July 11, 2019 to Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendants 1824 CARROLLTON LLC, TENA ALLEN, T.A.K.E. 3 INVESTMENTS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time)(Cowgur, Anne)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 7/30/2019 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 5/24/2019.(JRB)
May 24, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by T.A.K.E. 3 INVESTMENTS LLC identifying Corporate Parent T.A.K.E. 3 INVESTMENTS LLC for T.A.K.E. 3 INVESTMENTS LLC.. (Cowgur, Anne)
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 1824 CARROLLTON LLC identifying Corporate Parent 1824 CARROLLTON LLC for 1824 CARROLLTON LLC.. (Cowgur, Anne)
May 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to 1824 CARROLLTON LLC, and T.A.K.E. 3 INVESTMENTS LLC. (LAB) (DWH)
May 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants 1824 CARROLLTON LLC, TENA ALLEN, T.A.K.E. 3 INVESTMENTS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Cowgur, Anne)
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne L. Cowgur on behalf of Defendants 1824 CARROLLTON LLC, TENA ALLEN, T.A.K.E. 3 INVESTMENTS LLC. (Cowgur, Anne)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan G. Polak on behalf of Defendants 1824 CARROLLTON LLC, TENA ALLEN, T.A.K.E. 3 INVESTMENTS LLC. (Polak, Jonathan)
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to 1824 CARROLLTON LLC, T.A.K.E. 3 INVESTMENTS LLC. (REO)
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. Taylor on behalf of Plaintiff TRADE DESIGN STUDIO LLC. (Taylor, Christopher)
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to 1824 CARROLLTON LLC. (Taylor, Christopher)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to T.A.K.E. 3 INVESTMENTS LLC. (Taylor, Christopher)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET , filed by Plaintiff TRADE DESIGN STUDIO LLC. (Taylor, Christopher)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by TRADE DESIGN STUDIO LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5409413) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Taylor, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRADE DESIGN STUDIO LLC v. 1824 CARROLLTON LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.A.K.E. 3 INVESTMENTS LLC
Represented By: Anne L. Cowgur
Represented By: Jonathan G. Polak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1824 CARROLLTON LLC
Represented By: Anne L. Cowgur
Represented By: Jonathan G. Polak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TENA ALLEN
Represented By: Anne L. Cowgur
Represented By: Jonathan G. Polak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRADE DESIGN STUDIO LLC
Represented By: Christopher R. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?