METROPOLITAN PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY v. DAVIS et al

Plaintiff: METROPOLITAN PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: JANE DOE and NEIL C. DAVIS
Case Number: 1:2019cv01787
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
2 Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff METROPOLITAN PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY . (Stafford, Casey)
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by JANE DOE.(Emerson, James)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/10/2019 02:30 PM in room #234, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 6/13/2019.(SWM)
June 6, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, Appearance served on Neil C. Davis on May 13, 2019, filed by METROPOLITAN PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Cert Mail Sig Conf_Davis)(Stafford, Casey)
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant JANE DOE. (Hinkle, Matthew)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew L. Hinkle on behalf of Defendant JANE DOE. (Hinkle, Matthew)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James Alex Emerson on behalf of Defendant JANE DOE. (Emerson, James)
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Judge Richard L. Young. Judge Sarah Evans Barker is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:19-cv-01787-RLY-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (REO)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk is directed to randomly reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Judge. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 5/9/2019. (LDH)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to NEIL C. DAVIS, JANE DOE. (REO)
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by METROPOLITAN PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Stafford, Casey)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Casey Ray Stafford on behalf of Plaintiff METROPOLITAN PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Stafford, Casey)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants, filed by METROPOLITAN PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5411491) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Denial Letter, #3 Exhibit Policy, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons)(Stafford, Casey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: METROPOLITAN PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY v. DAVIS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE
Represented By: Matthew L. Hinkle
Represented By: James Alex Emerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEIL C. DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: METROPOLITAN PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Casey Ray Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?