CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION v. THOMPSON, SR.
Appellant: CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION
Appellee: DENNIS THOMPSON, SR.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01802
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 Notice to District Court: Appellee failed to file Designation of Record (BRB)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 TRANSCRIPT of Bankruptcy Court hearing held on 12/18/18 before Judge James M. Carr. (5 pages.) For information on obtaining copies, please contact the U.S. Bankruptcy Clerk's Office (Telephone: (317) 229-3800) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2019. (BRB)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #4 Bankruptcy Appeal (BRB)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-6525. File received, filed by CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION.(BRB)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 Notice to Parties of Briefing Schedule in accordance with Rule 8018 of the Bankruptcy Rules of Procedure. (JRB)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Dennis Mark Ostrowski hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Ostrowski, Dennis)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-6525. File received, filed by CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Deficient Filing)(BRB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION v. THOMPSON, SR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION
Represented By: Dennis Mark Ostrowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DENNIS THOMPSON, SR.
Represented By: John Andrew Sawin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?