GREGORY v. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff: BARBARA GREGORY
Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv01859
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal , filed by Defendant STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Trimble, John)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Directing Filing of Documents Authorizing Dismissal: The court has been advised that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this case. Therefore, all pending motions, if any, are now DENIED AS MOOT and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences, and trial, if any, are VACATED. Within thirty days of the date of this entry, counsel for the plaintiff shall file a motion to dismiss this cause and submit an order for the Court's signature ordering the dismissal of this action or a stipulation of dismissal (consistent with the agreement of the parties). Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/19/2019.(SWM)
June 11, 2019 Filing 12 Joint Proposed CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff BARBARA GREGORY . (Noyes, Jonathon)
June 6, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Defendant's Notice of Removal #1 , filed by Plaintiff BARBARA GREGORY. (Noyes, Jonathon) Modified on 6/7/2019 (CKM).
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathon Noyes on behalf of Plaintiff BARBARA GREGORY. (Noyes, Jonathon)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 6/19/2019 09:30 AM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 5/14/2019.(SWM)
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal (Exhibit 3 State Court Docket) by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Giordano, Michael)
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Defendant STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Giordano, Michael)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Giordano, Michael)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John Carl Trimble on behalf of Defendant STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Trimble, John)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY for STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY.. (Giordano, Michael)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Robert Giordano on behalf of Defendant STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Giordano, Michael)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Superior Court 13, case number 49D13-1904-CT-016897, filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5419318) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit State Court Record (Appearance, Complaint, Summons, Certificate of Issuance of Summons))(Giordano, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREGORY v. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: John Carl Trimble
Represented By: Michael Robert Giordano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA GREGORY
Represented By: Jonathon Noyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?