DJC PROPERTIES, LLC v. ARCH SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff: DJC PROPERTIES LLC and DJC PROPERTIES, LLC
Defendant: ARCH SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv01893
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Notice of Removal, re #5 NOTICE of Filing, filed by Plaintiff DJC PROPERTIES, LLC. (Wooton, Lewis)
June 20, 2019 Filing 14 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant ARCH SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Foran, Michael)
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant ARCH SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Foran, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 Submission of State Court Record from Marion County in case number 49D06-1904-PL-014893. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(REO)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Tracey Anne Jordan for ARCH SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY added. Copy to Tracey Jordan via US Mail in addition to notice regarding Change of Information needed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 6/7/2019. (RSF)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Michael L. Foran for ARCH SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY added. Copy sent to counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 6/6/2019. (JRB)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Tracey A. Jordan to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5466546), filed by Defendant ARCH SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Affidavit of Tracey Jordan, #2 Exhibit Illinois Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Glennon, James)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael L. Foran to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5465119), filed by Defendant ARCH SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Illinois Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit New York Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Glennon, James)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 7/31/2019 at 11:30 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 5/24/2019.(JRB)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ARCH SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent Arch Capital Group, Ltd., Other Affiliate ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate Arch Reinsurance Company for ARCH SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.. (Glennon, James)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Amended Petition for Removal by ARCH SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Glennon, James)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - The Court ORDERS Defendant to file an Amended Notice of Removal by May 24, 2019, which addresses the issues outlined in this Order and properly alleges a basis for this Court's diversity jurisdiction. Plaintiff is reminded of its obligation to file a statement within thirty days of Defendant's filing of the Amended Notice of Removal pursuant to Local Rule 81-1, which provides: Within 30 days after the filing of the notice of removal, every plaintiff who has not filed a motion to remand must file a statement responding to the notice of removal's allegations as to the citizenship of the parties and the amount in controversy. If the plaintiff lacks sufficient information upon which to form a belief about those allegations despite meeting and conferring in good faith with the removing party about them, the plaintiff may so state. The parties are advised that, to the extent the Amended Notice of Removal and the Local Rule 81-1 Statement reflect anything other than total agreement regarding any jurisdictional allegations, the Court will require the parties to conduct whatever investigation is necessary and file a joint jurisdictional statement confirming that all parties are in agreement with the underlying jurisdictional allegations before the litigation moves forward. (See Order). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 5/17/2019.(JDH)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James Bernard Glennon on behalf of Defendant ARCH SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Glennon, James)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Superior Court/Circuit Court, case number 49D06-1904-PL-014893, filed by ARCH SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5424102) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--State Court Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B--Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Glennon, James) Modified on 5/13/2019 (REO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DJC PROPERTIES, LLC v. ARCH SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARCH SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: James Bernard Glennon
Represented By: Michael L. Foran
Represented By: Tracey Anne Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DJC PROPERTIES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DJC PROPERTIES, LLC
Represented By: Lewis S. Wooton
Represented By: Brett Y. Hoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?