CALLAWAY v. DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC UTILITIES OF THE CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS, et al

Plaintiff: JAMES CALLAWAY
Defendant: THE CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS, DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC UTILITIES OF THE CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS D/B/A CITIZENS ENERGY GROUP and DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC UTILITIES OF THE CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS
Case Number: 1:2019cv01954
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC UTILITIES OF THE CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS. (Valle, Alejandro)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC UTILITIES OF THE CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS. (Valle, Alejandro)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Alejandro Valle on behalf of Defendant DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC UTILITIES OF THE CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS. (Valle, Alejandro)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by JAMES CALLAWAY. DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC UTILITIES OF THE CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS served on 6/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Cummings, Paul)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC UTILITIES OF THE CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS, THE CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS. (DWH)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Amended Complaint for Damages and Request for Jury Trial, filed by Plaintiff JAMES CALLAWAY (Cummings, Paul)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages and Request for Jury Trial against All Defendants, filed by JAMES CALLAWAY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Cummings, Paul)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J. Cummings on behalf of Plaintiff JAMES CALLAWAY. (Cummings, Paul)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Request for Jury Trial against All Defendants, filed by JAMES CALLAWAY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5432454) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cummings, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CALLAWAY v. DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC UTILITIES OF THE CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC UTILITIES OF THE CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS D/B/A CITIZENS ENERGY GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC UTILITIES OF THE CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS
Represented By: Alejandro Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES CALLAWAY
Represented By: Paul J. Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?