FREDERICK et al v. LAWSON et al
Plaintiff: MARY J FREDERICK, WILLIAM L MARKS, JR., JOHN JUSTIN COLLIER, MINNIE LEE CLARK, COMMON CAUSE INDIANA, WILLIAM L. MARKS, JR. and MARY J. FREDERICK
Defendant: M CATHERINE FINELLO, CONNIE LAWSON, RITA L GLENN, ST. JOSEPH COUNTY ELECTION BOARD, MURRAY WINN, RITA L. GLENN and M. CATHERINE FINELLO
Case Number: 1:2019cv01959
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 19 Submission of Signature Requirement re #17 Brief/Memorandum in Support by M. CATHERINE FINELLO, RITA L. GLENN, ST. JOSEPH COUNTY ELECTION BOARD, MURRAY WINN. (Agostino, Peter)
July 12, 2019 Filing 18 Submission of Signature Requirement re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by M. CATHERINE FINELLO, RITA L. GLENN, ST. JOSEPH COUNTY ELECTION BOARD, MURRAY WINN. (Agostino, Peter)
July 11, 2019 Filing 17 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants RITA L. GLENN, ST. JOSEPH COUNTY ELECTION BOARD, MURRAY WINN. (Agostino, Peter)
July 11, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants M. CATHERINE FINELLO, RITA L. GLENN, ST. JOSEPH COUNTY ELECTION BOARD, MURRAY WINN. (Agostino, Peter)
July 10, 2019 Filing 15 DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Plaintiffs MINNIE LEE CLARK, JOHN JUSTIN COLLIER, COMMON CAUSE INDIANA, MARY J. FREDERICK, WILLIAM L. MARKS, JR. (Sniderman, Mark)
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Sniderman, Mark)
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Parvinder Kaur Nijjar on behalf of Defendant CONNIE LAWSON. (Nijjar, Parvinder)
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant CONNIE LAWSON. (Garn, Jefferson)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jefferson S. Garn on behalf of Defendant CONNIE LAWSON. (Garn, Jefferson)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by All Plaintiffs. M. CATHERINE FINELLO served on 5/24/2019; RITA L. GLENN served on 5/24/2019; CONNIE LAWSON served on 5/24/2019; ST. JOSEPH COUNTY ELECTION BOARD served on 5/24/2019; MURRAY WINN served on 5/24/2019. (Groth, William)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants M. CATHERINE FINELLO, RITA L. GLENN, ST. JOSEPH COUNTY ELECTION BOARD, MURRAY WINN. (Colborn, Bradley)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants M. CATHERINE FINELLO, RITA L. GLENN, ST. JOSEPH COUNTY ELECTION BOARD, MURRAY WINN. (Colborn, Bradley)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley P. Colborn on behalf of Defendants M. CATHERINE FINELLO, RITA L. GLENN, ST. JOSEPH COUNTY ELECTION BOARD, MURRAY WINN. (Colborn, Bradley)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter John Agostino on behalf of Defendants M. CATHERINE FINELLO, RITA L. GLENN, ST. JOSEPH COUNTY ELECTION BOARD, MURRAY WINN. (Agostino, Peter)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to M. CATHERINE FINELLO, RITA L. GLENN, CONNIE LAWSON, ST. JOSEPH COUNTY ELECTION BOARD, MURRAY WINN. (REO)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark W. Sniderman on behalf of Plaintiffs MINNIE LEE CLARK, JOHN JUSTIN COLLIER, COMMON CAUSE INDIANA, MARY J FREDERICK, WILLIAM L MARKS, JR. (Sniderman, Mark)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Groth on behalf of Plaintiffs MINNIE LEE CLARK, JOHN JUSTIN COLLIER, COMMON CAUSE INDIANA, MARY J FREDERICK, WILLIAM L MARKS, JR. (Groth, William)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5432897) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Groth, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FREDERICK et al v. LAWSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY J FREDERICK
Represented By: Mark W. Sniderman
Represented By: William R. Groth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM L MARKS, JR.
Represented By: Mark W. Sniderman
Represented By: William R. Groth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN JUSTIN COLLIER
Represented By: Mark W. Sniderman
Represented By: William R. Groth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MINNIE LEE CLARK
Represented By: Mark W. Sniderman
Represented By: William R. Groth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMON CAUSE INDIANA
Represented By: Mark W. Sniderman
Represented By: William R. Groth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM L. MARKS, JR.
Represented By: Mark W. Sniderman
Represented By: William R. Groth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY J. FREDERICK
Represented By: Mark W. Sniderman
Represented By: William R. Groth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M CATHERINE FINELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONNIE LAWSON
Represented By: Jefferson S. Garn
Represented By: Parvinder Kaur Nijjar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RITA L GLENN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ST. JOSEPH COUNTY ELECTION BOARD
Represented By: Peter John Agostino
Represented By: Bradley P. Colborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MURRAY WINN
Represented By: Peter John Agostino
Represented By: Bradley P. Colborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RITA L. GLENN
Represented By: Peter John Agostino
Represented By: Bradley P. Colborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. CATHERINE FINELLO
Represented By: Peter John Agostino
Represented By: Bradley P. Colborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?