MONROE v. CACH, LLC.
Plaintiff: JEREMY MONROE
Defendant: CACH, LLC and CACH, LLC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01987
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 Joint CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff JEREMY MONROE . (Shea, Richard)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint & Affirmative Defenses, filed by CACH, LLC..(Saldanha Olson, Katherine)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/23/2019 09:30 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/20/2019.(SWM)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant CACH, LLC.. (Strickler, Nicole)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CACH, LLC.. (Strickler, Nicole)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Marie Strickler on behalf of Defendant CACH, LLC.. (Strickler, Nicole)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine M. Saldanha Olson on behalf of Defendant CACH, LLC.. (Saldanha Olson, Katherine)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of Personal Service, filed by JEREMY MONROE. CACH, LLC. served on 5/31/2019. (Shea, Richard)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CACH, LLC.. (HET)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard John Shea, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff JEREMY MONROE. (Shea, Richard)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CACH, LLC, filed by JEREMY MONROE. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5437984) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Debt Collector License Information, #2 Exhibit 2 - December 17, 2018, Letter sent by Plaintiff's Counsel, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Affidavit, #4 Envelope A - Relevant Pages of Plaintiff's February 20, 2019, TransUnion Credit Report, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons)(Shea, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MONROE v. CACH, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEREMY MONROE
Represented By: Richard John Shea, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CACH, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CACH, LLC.
Represented By: Nicole Marie Strickler
Represented By: Katherine M. Saldanha Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?