ALLEN v. IMC CREDIT SERVICES, LLC.
Plaintiff: JOHN ALLEN
Defendant: IMC CREDIT SERVICES, LLC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01988
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Doris L Pryor
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/6/2019 at 4:30 PM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. No fewer than seven days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 6/19/2019.(CBU)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against IMC CREDIT SERVICES, LLC., filed by JOHN ALLEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Debt Collector License Information, #2 Exhibit 2 - The November 26, 2018 letter sent by Plaintiff's Counsel., #3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Affidavit, #4 Exhibit A - Relevant Pages of Plaintiff's February 14, 2019, TransUnion Credit Report)(Shea, Richard)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by IMC CREDIT SERVICES, LLC.. (Levi, Nicholas)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant IMC CREDIT SERVICES, LLC.. (Levi, Nicholas)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Ward Levi on behalf of Defendant IMC CREDIT SERVICES, LLC.. (Levi, Nicholas)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Personal Service, filed by JOHN ALLEN. IMC CREDIT SERVICES, LLC. served on 5/31/2019. (Shea, Richard)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to IMC CREDIT SERVICES, LLC.. (HET)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard John Shea, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff JOHN ALLEN. (Shea, Richard)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against IMC CREDIT SERVICES, LLC., filed by JOHN ALLEN. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5438196) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Debt Collector's License, #2 Exhibit 2 - The November 26, 2018, Letter Sent by Plaintiff's Counsel, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Affidavit, #4 Exhibit A - Relevant Pages of Plaintiff's February 14, 2019, TransUnion Credit Report, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons)(Shea, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALLEN v. IMC CREDIT SERVICES, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN ALLEN
Represented By: Richard John Shea, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMC CREDIT SERVICES, LLC.
Represented By: Nicholas Ward Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?