KELLEY v. HOPEBRIDGE, LLC

Plaintiff: ANGELIQUE KELLEY
Defendant: HOPEBRIDGE, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02003
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Oakley on behalf of Plaintiff ANGELIQUE KELLEY. (Oakley, Robert)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/12/2019 01:30 PM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/26/2019.(SWM)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HOPEBRIDGE, LLC. (Terrell, Michael)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by HOPEBRIDGE, LLC.(Terrell, Michael)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Thornton Escoffery on behalf of Defendant HOPEBRIDGE, LLC. (Escoffery, Erin)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C. Terrell on behalf of Defendant HOPEBRIDGE, LLC. (Terrell, Michael)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to HOPEBRIDGE, LLC. (REO)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Kyle Dilley on behalf of Plaintiff ANGELIQUE KELLEY. (Dilley, Daniel)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANGELIQUE KELLEY, filed by ANGELIQUE KELLEY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5439439) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Dilley, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KELLEY v. HOPEBRIDGE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELIQUE KELLEY
Represented By: Daniel Kyle Dilley
Represented By: Robert M. Oakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOPEBRIDGE, LLC
Represented By: Michael C. Terrell
Represented By: Erin Thornton Escoffery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?