TAYLOR v. FIRST DATA CORPORATION

Plaintiff: VAUGHN K. TAYLOR
Defendant: FIRST DATA CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv02007
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Discovery due by 12/13/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 7/16/2019.(CBU)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/16/2019. Approved Case Management Plan, as amended, to be entered by separate order. Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/3/2019 at 10:45 AM (Eastern Time). Settlement Conference set for 11/7/2019 at 9:00 AM (Eastern Time) in room #257, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana. *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDERS. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 7/16/2019.(SWM)
July 8, 2019 Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff VAUGHN K. TAYLOR . (Volheim, Nathan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by FIRST DATA CORPORATION.(Jeter, Christopher)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Joshua Horn for FIRST DATA CORPORATION added. If not already registered with the Court's Electronic Filing System, Joshua Horn is ordered to register within ten (10) days of the entry of this order. Copy to Joshua Horn via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 6/26/2019. (SWM)
June 25, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FIRST DATA CORPORATION. (Jeter, Christopher)
June 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joshua Horn to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5496787), filed by Defendant FIRST DATA CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Certification of Joshua Horn In Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Jeter, Christopher)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/16/2019 04:30 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference. Section III(A) through (E) of the proposed CMP shall include the following deadlines (see Order for established deadlines). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 6/18/2019.(SWM)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Defendant's #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 6/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 6/18/2019. (SWM)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to June 27, 2019 , filed by Defendant FIRST DATA CORPORATION. (Jeter, Christopher)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Paul Jeter on behalf of Defendant FIRST DATA CORPORATION. (Jeter, Christopher)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of Service, filed by VAUGHN K. TAYLOR. FIRST DATA CORPORATION served on 5/23/2019. (Volheim, Nathan)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to FIRST DATA CORPORATION. (HET)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric D. Coleman on behalf of Plaintiff VAUGHN K. TAYLOR. (Coleman, Eric)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis on behalf of Plaintiff VAUGHN K. TAYLOR. (Hatzidimitriadis, Taxiarchis)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan C. Volheim on behalf of Plaintiff VAUGHN K. TAYLOR. (Volheim, Nathan)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FIRST DATA CORPORATION, filed by VAUGHN K. TAYLOR. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5440107) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Volheim, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TAYLOR v. FIRST DATA CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VAUGHN K. TAYLOR
Represented By: Nathan C. Volheim
Represented By: Eric D. Coleman
Represented By: Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRST DATA CORPORATION
Represented By: Christopher Paul Jeter
Represented By: Joshua Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?