VIRGNE v. C.R. ENGLAND, INC.,

Plaintiff: DERRICK VIRGNE
Defendant: C.R. ENGLAND, INC.,
Case Number: 1:2019cv02011
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227b3
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) , filed by Defendant C.R. ENGLAND, INC.,. (Almeida, David)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6), filed by Defendant C.R. ENGLAND, INC.,. (Almeida, David)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by C.R. ENGLAND, INC.,. (Almeida, David)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to C.R. ENGLAND, INC. (LAB) (CKM)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant C.R. ENGLAND, INC.,. (Almeida, David)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David S. Almeida on behalf of Defendant C.R. ENGLAND, INC.,. (Almeida, David)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of Service, filed by DERRICK VIRGNE. C.R. ENGLAND, INC., served on 6/6/2019. (Cueller, Amy)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to C.R. ENGLAND, INC.,. (HET)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy L. Cueller on behalf of Plaintiff DERRICK VIRGNE. (Cueller, Amy)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against C.R. ENGLAND, INC.,, filed by DERRICK VIRGNE. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5440479) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Cueller, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VIRGNE v. C.R. ENGLAND, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DERRICK VIRGNE
Represented By: Amy L. Cueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. ENGLAND, INC.,
Represented By: David S. Almeida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?