COOK v. PRAXAIR SURFACE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Plaintiff: ERIN COOK
Defendant: PRAXAIR SURFACE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02015
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Resetting Initial Pretrial Conference: The court, on its own motion, VACATES the initial pretrial conference set for August 7, 2019, and RESETS it for August 12, 2019, at 2:00 p.m. (Eastern). All other provisions of the court's Order Setting Initial Pretrial Conference (Dkt. 10) remain in full force and effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/26/2019.(SWM)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #12 Motion to Strike Document. It is ordered that Docket Number 11 is hereby withdrawn as having been inadvertently filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/24/2019. (SWM)
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 Submission of Proposed Order , re #12 MOTION to Strike #11 Notice of Appearance , filed by Plaintiff ERIN COOK. (Bullock, Bryan)
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan K. Bullock on behalf of Plaintiff ERIN COOK. (Bullock, Bryan)
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Strike #11 Notice of Appearance , filed by Plaintiff ERIN COOK. (Bullock, Bryan)
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 *** WITHDRRAWN PER ORDER DATED 6/24/2019 *** NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan K. Bullock on behalf of Plaintiff ERIN COOK. (Bullock, Bryan) Modified on 6/24/2019 (SWM).
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/7/2019 02:00 PM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/20/2019.(SWM)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant PRAXAIR SURFACE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Romaniuk, Jennifer)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. Romaniuk on behalf of Defendant PRAXAIR SURFACE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Romaniuk, Jennifer)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan L. McLaughlin on behalf of Defendant PRAXAIR SURFACE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (McLaughlin, Alan)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by ERIN COOK. PRAXAIR SURFACE TECHNOLOGIES, INC. served on 6/3/2019. (Biesecker, Kyle)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 TRIAL PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (DWH)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to PRAXAIR SURFACE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (HET)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Dutkanych, III on behalf of Plaintiff ERIN COOK. (Dutkanych, Andrew)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PRAXAIR SURFACE TECHNOLOGIES, INC., filed by ERIN COOK. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5441218) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dutkanych, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COOK v. PRAXAIR SURFACE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRAXAIR SURFACE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Represented By: Jennifer L. Romaniuk
Represented By: Alan L. McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIN COOK
Represented By: Andrew Dutkanych, III
Represented By: Bryan K. Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?