SOTO v. GARZA et al

Plaintiff: JUAN SOTO
Defendant: GARY GARZA and C.R. ENGLAND, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02055
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 Defendants' ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint (Second Amended Complaint), filed by C.R. ENGLAND, INC., GARY GARZA.(Hyslop, Chelsea)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants, filed by JUAN SOTO.(Karres, Katherine)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ON JURISDICTION - The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file an amended complaint by July 2, 2019, that alleges the citizenship of the parties. Because "an amended complaint supersedes any prior complaint," Riley v. Elkhart Community Schools, 829 F.3d 886, 890 (7th Cir. 2016), Defendants should answer the second amended complaint rather than the initial complaint. (See Order). Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 6/18/2019.(JDH)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea Steele Hyslop on behalf of Defendants C.R. ENGLAND, INC., GARY GARZA. (Hyslop, Chelsea)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric A. Riegner on behalf of Defendants C.R. ENGLAND, INC., GARY GARZA. (Riegner, Eric)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants, filed by JUAN SOTO.(Karres, Katherine)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Plaintiff has filed a Complaint in which she alleges that this Court has diversity jurisdiction over this matter. For the Court to have diversity jurisdiction over the parties, the amount in controversy must exceed "$75,000, exclusive of interest and costs." Therefore, the Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint by June 21, 2019, which addresses the issue outlined in this Order and properly alleges a basis for this Court's diversity jurisdiction (SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION). Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 5/31/2019.(DWH)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to C.R. ENGLAND, INC., GARY GARZA. (HET)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine G. Karres on behalf of Plaintiff JUAN SOTO. (Karres, Katherine)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JUAN SOTO. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5444808) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Karres, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SOTO v. GARZA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUAN SOTO
Represented By: Katherine G. Karres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARY GARZA
Represented By: Chelsea Steele Hyslop
Represented By: Eric A. Riegner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. ENGLAND, INC.
Represented By: Chelsea Steele Hyslop
Represented By: Eric A. Riegner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?