SMITH v. LCS FINANCIAL SERVICES CORPORATION
Plaintiff: ANGELA SMITH, n/k/a McJUNKIN and ANGELA SMITH
Defendant: LCS FINANCIAL SERVICES CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv02165
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 CLOSED DISMISSED - MARGINAL ENTRY - Dismissal with prejudice acknowledged #10 . Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 6/19/2019.(JDH)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Plaintiff ANGELA SMITH. (Philipps, David)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF A PLEADING AUTHORIZING DISMISSAL. The Court has been advised by counsel that a settlement has been reached in this action. All that remains to be done is the execution of documents and/or delivery of funds, if so required, in accordance with their agreement. Therefore, all pending motions, if any, are now DENIED AS MOOT and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences and trial, if any, are VACATED. IT IS ORDERED that within forty five (45) days from the date of this order, counsel for the plaintiff shall file a motion to dismiss this cause or a stipulation of dismissal and submit an order for the Court's signature ordering the dismissal of this action (in conformance with the agreement of the parties). Failure to comply with this order may result in DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 41(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. for failure to prosecute this action in a timely manner. Additional time to complete the execution of the settlement document may be granted if requested in writing prior to the expiration of this period of time.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 6/7/2019.(TMB)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to LCS FINANCIAL SERVICES CORPORATION. (DJH)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Steinkamp on behalf of Plaintiff ANGELA SMITH, n/k/a McJUNKIN. (Steinkamp, John)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Angie K. Robertson on behalf of Plaintiff ANGELA SMITH, n/k/a McJUNKIN. (Robertson, Angie)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary E. Philipps on behalf of Plaintiff ANGELA SMITH, n/k/a McJUNKIN. (Philipps, Mary)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Philipps on behalf of Plaintiff ANGELA SMITH, n/k/a McJUNKIN. (Philipps, David)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LCS FINANCIAL SERVICES CORPORATION, filed by ANGELA SMITH, n/k/a McJUNKIN. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5455886) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Indiana Secretary of State Corporate Information, #2 Exhibit B - NMLS State License Information, #3 Exhibit C - Amended Statement of Intention for Individuals Filing Under Chapter 7, #4 Exhibit D - Bankruptcy 341 Notice, #5 Exhibit E - Bankruptcy Discharge Order, #6 Exhibit F - Collection Letter, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Proposed Summons)(Philipps, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH v. LCS FINANCIAL SERVICES CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA SMITH, n/k/a McJUNKIN
Represented By: Mary E. Philipps
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: Angie K. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA SMITH
Represented By: Mary E. Philipps
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: Angie K. Robertson
Represented By: John Thomas Steinkamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LCS FINANCIAL SERVICES CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?