O'ROURKE v. RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC
Plaintiff: PHYLLIS A O'ROURKE and PHYLLIS ANN O'ROURKE
Defendant: RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC, d/b/a RMP, LLC and RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02223
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN of Service, filed by PHYLLIS ANN O'ROURKE. RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC served on 6/24/2019. (Philipps, David)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC identifying Corporate Parent RMP GROUP, INC. for RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC.. (Levi, Nicholas)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC. (Levi, Nicholas)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Ward Levi on behalf of Defendant RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC. (Levi, Nicholas)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jackson Lee Schroeder on behalf of Defendant RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC. (Schroeder, Jackson)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC. (REO)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Steinkamp on behalf of Plaintiff PHYLLIS A O'ROURKE. (Steinkamp, John)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Angie K. Robertson on behalf of Plaintiff PHYLLIS A O'ROURKE. (Robertson, Angie)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary E. Philipps on behalf of Plaintiff PHYLLIS A O'ROURKE. (Philipps, Mary)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Philipps on behalf of Plaintiff PHYLLIS A O'ROURKE. (Philipps, David)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC, d/b/a RMP, LLC, filed by PHYLLIS A O'ROURKE. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5461659) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Indiana Secretary of State Corporate Information, #2 Exhibit B - NMLS State License Information, #3 Exhibit C - excerpt of Bankruptcy Schedule E/F, #4 Exhibit D - Bankruptcy 341 Notice, #5 Exhibit E - Collection Letter, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons)(Philipps, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'ROURKE v. RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC, d/b/a RMP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC
Represented By: Jackson Lee Schroeder
Represented By: Nicholas Ward Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHYLLIS A O'ROURKE
Represented By: Mary E. Philipps
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: John Thomas Steinkamp
Represented By: Angie K. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHYLLIS ANN O'ROURKE
Represented By: Mary E. Philipps
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: John Thomas Steinkamp
Represented By: Angie K. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?